Global Patent Index - EP 1065055 A1

EP 1065055 A1 2001-01-03 - Device for decorating voluminous objects

Title (en)

Device for decorating voluminous objects

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Dekorieren von voluminösen Gegenständen

Title (fr)

Dispositif permettant de réaliser des décorations sur des objets volumineux

Publication

EP 1065055 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00440201 A

Priority

FR 9908667 A

Abstract (en)

The apparatus consists of a mobile printing head (1) equipped with multiple printing elements (3) able to move independently of one another towards or away from the surface (2) being decorated. The printing head is mounted on a support in the form of a chassis travelling on fixed guides so it can move in three dimensions and modify the angle of its axis of projection to provide continuous decoration of adjacent surfaces in different planes. The printing elements are set in four columns (30, 31, 32, 33) or rows, one for each of four colours - blue, red, yellow and black.

Abstract (fr)

Dispositif permettant de réaliser des décorations sur des objets volumineux, comportant une tête d'impression mobile (1) équipée d'une multiplicité d'éléments d'impression (3) aptes à se déplacer, indépendamment les uns des autres, en rapprochement ou en éloignement de la surface à décorer (2) afin d'en épouser à distance les reliefs. La tête d'impression (1) est montée sur un moyen support apte à la déplacer dans les trois dimensions et à modifier l'orientation de son axe de projection afin de permettre de décorer, en continu, au moins deux surfaces adjacentes disposées dans des plans différents. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/01

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/01 (2006.01); B41J 3/407 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/01 (2013.01); B41J 3/4073 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1065055 A1 20010103; CA 2312561 A1 20010101; FR 2795662 A1 20010105; FR 2795662 B1 20020308

INPADOC legal status


2008-02-01 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1035698

2004-07-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040101

2001-09-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010518

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI