Global Patent Index - EP 1065071 A1

EP 1065071 A1 2001-01-03 - Aluminum alloy strip used for making lithographic plate and method of production

Title (en)

Aluminum alloy strip used for making lithographic plate and method of production

Title (de)

Lithoband und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung

Title (fr)

Bande en alliage d'aluminium pour plaques d'impression lithographique et procédé pour sa préparation

Publication

EP 1065071 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00110267 A

Priority

  • DE 19930720 A
  • DE 19956692 A

Abstract (en)

Lithographic strip consists of a rolled aluminum (Al) alloy contains 0.30-0.40% iron, 0.10-0.30% magnesium, 0.05-0.25% silicon, NOTGREATER 0.05% manganese and NOTGREATER 0.04% copper and impurities from manufacture and has an alternating bending strength of over 1250 cycles perpendicular to the rolling direction and a tensile strength (Rm) of over 145 N/mm<2> after 240 degrees C/10 minutes annealing. Independent claims are also included for: (a) the production of the strip; (b) the production of a printing plate substrate from the strip; (c) the production of a printing plate for roll offset printing by providing the substrate with a light-sensitive, hydrophobic coating.

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein Lithoband für den Einsatz als Offset-Druckplatten beschrieben, das eine Zusammensetzung von 0,05-0,25 % Si, 0,30 - 0,40 % Fe, 0,10 - 0,30 % Mg, max. 0,05 % Mn und max. 0,04 % Cu aufweist. Das Band wird aus einem Stranggußbarren obiger Zusammensetzung hergestellt, der bis an eine Dicke von 2-7 mm warmgewalzt wird. Das Restwiderstandsverhältnis des Warmbandes beträgt RR = 10-20. Das Kaltwalzen erfolgt ohne oder mit Zwischenglühungen, wobei der Abwalzgrad nach der Zwischenglühung > 60 % beträgt. Die Weiterverarbeitung bis zur EC-Aufrauhung findet mit dem im Walzprozeß eingestellten Gefügezustand bei < 100°C statt. Das Lithoband zeichnet sich durch eine hohe thermische Stabilität, ein gutes Aufrauhverhalten in EC-Prozessen und eine hohe Biegewechselbeständigkeit senkrecht zur Walzrichtung aus.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41N 3/00; B41N 3/03; C22C 21/00; C22F 1/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41N 1/08 (2006.01); B21B 3/00 (2006.01); B22D 11/00 (2006.01); B22D 11/12 (2006.01); B41N 3/00 (2006.01); B41N 3/03 (2006.01); C22C 21/00 (2006.01); C22C 21/08 (2006.01); C22F 1/00 (2006.01); C22F 1/04 (2006.01); C25D 11/16 (2006.01); G03F 7/00 (2006.01); G03F 7/09 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22F 1/04 (2013.01); B41N 3/034 (2013.01); C22C 21/00 (2013.01); B41N 3/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB GR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1065071 A1 20010103; EP 1065071 B1 20041110; BR 0002955 A 20010403; BR 0002955 B1 20090113; DE 29924474 U1 20030828; ES 2232347 T3 20050601; JP 2001049373 A 20010220; JP 2004250794 A 20040909; JP 4170933 B2 20081022; KR 100390654 B1 20030707; KR 20010049633 A 20010615; US 6447982 B1 20020910

INPADOC legal status


2012-05-31 [REG DE R107] PUBLICATION OF GRANT OF EUROPEAN PATENT RESCINDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: R107

- Ref Document Number: 50008568

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120531

2012-04-11 [27W] REVOKED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27W

- Effective date: 20111215

2012-04-11 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPR

- Effective date: 20111215

2011-12-15 [REG DE R064] EPO'S REVOCATION DECISION NOW FINAL

- Ref Legal Event Code: R064

- Ref Document Number: 50008568

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2011-12-15 [REG DE R103] PATENT REVOKED BY EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: R103

- Ref Document Number: 50008568

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2011-09-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110520

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110520

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-07-29 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110520

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-07-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110607

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110525

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-11-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-10-05 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: NOVELIS, INC.

- Effective date: 20050810

2005-06-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2232347

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2005-03-30 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20050307

2005-03-28 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

- Ref Document Number: 20050400457

- Country of Ref Document: GR

2004-12-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50008568

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-12-16

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-11-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB GR

2004-11-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-07-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HYDRO ALUMINIUM DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-05-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030404

2001-09-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB GR

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001117

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB GR

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI