Global Patent Index - EP 1065119 A1

EP 1065119 A1 2001-01-03 - Passenger transport installation

Title (en)

Passenger transport installation

Title (de)

Anlage zum Transport von Personen

Title (fr)

Installation de transport de personnes

Publication

EP 1065119 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00890071 A

Priority

AT 111199 A

Abstract (en)

The system has two sets of rails, each with a conveying cable to couple a vehicle to a clamp device and brake, conveying and acceleration wheels arranged in the stations to co-operate with the vehicle. The sets of rails are arranged on top of trough shaped support constructions (1,2). Both wall parts of the support constructions are connected in the running path by cross-wise struts (15,15a) and are connected in the station area by moulded bulkhead plates (25), inside which the drive rollers for the vehicle and the guide rollers for the conveyor cable.

Abstract (de)

Anlage zum Transport von Personen mittels längs Schienen verfahrbarer Fahrzeuge, mit zwei auf Stützen angeordneten Fahrbahnen, mit einem Förderseil, an welches die Fahrzeuge mittels Klemmvorrichtungen ankuppelbar sind und mit in den Stationen angeordneten, mit den Fahrzeugen zusammenwirkenden Bremsrädern, Förderrädern und Beschleunigungsrädern. Dabei sind die Fahrbahnen an den oberen Enden von im Querschnitt trogförmig ausgebildeten Tragkonstruktionen (1, 2) angeordnet, wobei die beiden Schenkel der trogförmigen Tragkonstruktionen (1, 2) in den Bereichen der Strecke miteinander durch einander räumlich kreuzende Streben (15, 15a) und in den Bereichen der Stationen durch muldenförmige Schottbleche (25), innerhalb welcher die Antriebsrollen (51, 52, 53) für die Fahrzeuge (10) und Führungsrollen (41) für das Förderseil (4) angeordnet sind, verbunden sind (Fig.2). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61B 9/00; E01B 25/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61B 9/00 (2006.01); E01B 25/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61B 9/00 (2013.01); E01B 25/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1065119 A1 20010103; AT 409746 B 20021025; AT A111199 A 20020315; CA 2310695 A1 20001224; CA 2310695 C 20060801

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030918

2003-06-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030507

2001-09-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010216

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI