Global Patent Index - EP 1065126 A1

EP 1065126 A1 2001-01-03 - Conveyor installation for transporting, moving, distributing and positioning of railway wagons

Title (en)

Conveyor installation for transporting, moving, distributing and positioning of railway wagons

Title (de)

Förderanlage zum Fördern, Verschieben, Verteilen und Positionieren von Eisenbahnwaggons

Title (fr)

Installation de convoyage pour transporter, déplacer, distribuer et positionner des wagons ferroviaires

Publication

EP 1065126 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00113615 A

Priority

DE 19929389 A

Abstract (en)

A hauling cable (5) is fixed to a truck which drives the cable in towing and return directions. The truck has a hauling arm (17) and/or a braking arm which blocks the path of the railway wagon when in its engagement position, and which can be brought into a rest position in which it does not block the path by a force transmitter. A power accumulator is provided on the truck for operating the force transmitter and can be charged in a contactless fashion or by temporary contact. The power accumulator may be an electrochemical battery which can be inductively coupled to a current source.

Abstract (de)

Eine Förderanlage zum Fördern, Verschieben, Verteilen und Positionieren von Eisenbahnwaggons längs einer Förderstrecke weist einen Förderwagen (1) auf. Dieser hat ein frei drehbares Fahrwerk und ist mittels eines Zugseils (8,9) und eines Antriebs für das Zugseil in Schlepp- und in Rückholrichtung fahrbar. Der Förderwagen (1) weist einen Mitnehmer insbesondere einen Förderarm (17) und oder einen Bremsarm auf, welcher in seiner Eingriffsposition in den Fahrweg des Eisenbahnwaggons eingreift und welcher durch Kraftgeber in eine Ruheposition schwenkbar sind, in welcher er nicht in den Fahrweg des Eisenbahnwaggons hinein ragt. Zur Betätigung des Kraftgebers ist auf dem Förderwagen ein Energiespeicher angebracht, welcher berührungslos oder durch nur zeitweiligen Kontakt aufladbar ist. Der Energiespeicher kann in der Ruheposition des Förderwagens berührungslos, insbesondere induktiv oder durch Kontakt mit einer Energiequelle verbindbar sein. Der Energiespeicher ist eine aufladbare elektrochemische Batterie oder eine aufladbarer elektrochemischer Akkumulator, welche bzw. welcher über eine induktive Kupplung mit einer elektrischen Stromquelle verbindbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61J 3/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61J 3/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61J 3/06 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1065126 A1 20010103; EP 1065126 B1 20040825; AT 274434 T 20040915

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160629

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160624

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160624

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-07-15 [REG AT HC] CHANGE OF THE FIRM NAME OR FIRM ADDRESS

- Owner name: PINTSCH TIEFENBACH GMBH, DE

- Document: AT 274434 T

- Effective date: 20140516

2013-07-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: PINTSCH TIEFENBACH GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: TIEFENBACH GMBH, DE

2009-07-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: SCHMAUDER & PARTNER AG PATENT- UND MARKENANWAELTE VSP;ZWAENGIWEG 7;8038 ZUERICH (CH)

2005-08-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050526

2004-12-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SCHMAUDER & PARTNER AG PATENTANWALTSBUERO

2004-09-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50007544 P 20040930

2004-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-08-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI

2001-09-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE LI

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001206

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI