Global Patent Index - EP 1065148 A1

EP 1065148 A1 2001-01-03 - Article comprising a plurality of brick-shaped containers provided with a closure

Title (en)

Article comprising a plurality of brick-shaped containers provided with a closure

Title (de)

Artikel bestehend aus einer Vielzahl von mit einem Verschluss versehenen quaderförmigen Verpackungen

Title (fr)

Article comprenant des récipients en forme de brique avec obturateur

Publication

EP 1065148 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00401793 A

Priority

FR 9908149 A

Abstract (en)

The package, made up of four, six or eight brick-shaped containers (4) with caps (12) which project above their upper surfaces, has a rectangular-section wedge (14) which is located between the caps and has a thickness equivalent to their height to prevent pressure on the caps from other packages stacked on top. The package is e.g. in the form of a plastic wrapper round the containers, and the ends of the wedge are attached to the package by adhesive strips (18) so it can be used as a carrying handle. The wedge can be made from various synthetic materials, cellular or corrugated cardboard or an inflated chamber.

Abstract (fr)

L'article (2) comprend au moins un récipient (4) et un obturateur (12) s'étendant sur le récipient. L'article comprend en outre une cale (14) ne constituant pas un obturateur et s'étendant sur le récipient de sorte qu'une hauteur de l'article (2) au niveau de la cale (14) est sensiblement identique à une hauteur de l'article au niveau de l'obturateur (12). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 21/02; B65D 71/00; B65D 75/00; B65D 75/56; B65D 81/107

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 21/02 (2006.01); B65D 71/00 (2006.01); B65D 71/06 (2006.01); B65D 75/00 (2006.01); B65D 75/56 (2006.01); B65D 81/107 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 71/066 (2013.01); B65D 21/0224 (2013.01); B65D 75/004 (2013.01); B65D 75/56 (2013.01); B65D 81/107 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1065148 A1 20010103; FR 2795395 A1 20001229; FR 2795395 B1 20010914

INPADOC legal status


2006-08-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060301

2005-11-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CHAZELLE ROBERT

2005-11-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BERTHOME ALAIN

2003-10-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030821

2001-12-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011022

2001-12-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-09-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Inventor name: BERTHOME ALAIN

2001-02-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CHAZELLE ROBERT

2001-02-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BERTHOME ALAIN

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI