Global patent index - EP 1065152 A1

EP 1065152 A1 2001-01-03 - Blister package

Title (en)

Blister package

Title (de)

Blisterpackung

Title (fr)

Emballage de type blister

Publication

EP 1065152 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99810478 A

Priority

EP 99810478 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0075037A1] The invention relates to a blister pack (1) with a base part (2) with at least one depression (3) that is surrounded by a shoulder, the entirety of shoulders forming a contiguous surface. A cover film (5) is sealed onto the base part (2) and covers the openings (4) of the depressions. The base part (2) is provided with means (9) that facilitate the opening of the pack. Said means are configured as one or more flat parts that are defined by separating lines (7), preferably in the form of indentations (10). Said indentations can be bent along the separating lines (7) at least partially outwards from the base part (2) and are characterized by at least one edge or tip so that, with the help of the bent flat part (10), the cover film (5) positioned above the opening (4) of the depression can be undone, perforated, broken or weakened to such an extent that the product contained therein can be forced through the depression (3) by hand.

Abstract (de)

Eine Blisterpackung (1) enthält ein Bodenteil (2) mit wenigstens einer Vertiefung (3), die von einer Schulter umgeben sind, wobei die Schultern insgesamt eine zusammenhängede, plane Fläche bilden. Eine Abdeckfolie (5) ist auf das Bodenteil (2) aufgesiegelt und verschliesst die Vertiefungsöffnungen (4). Im Bodenteil (2) sind Öffnungshilfen (9) in der Ausgestaltung von einem oder mehreren durch Schwächungslinien (7) begrenzten Flächenteilen, vorzugsweise Zacken (10), vorgesehen, welche sich entlang der Schwächungslinien (7) wenigsten teilweise aus dem Bodenteil (2) umbiegen lassen, und welche wenigstens eine Kante oder Spitze aufweisen, so dass mit dem umgebogenen Flächenteil (10) die über der Vertiefungsöffnung (4) liegende Abdeckfolie (5) aufgetrennt, durchlöchert, verletzt oder derart geschwächt werden kann, dass sich der Inhaltsstoff von Hand aus der Vertiefung (3) durchdrücken lässt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 75/34; B65D 75/58; B65D 83/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 83/04 (2006.01); A61J 1/03 (2006.01); B65D 75/32 (2006.01); B65D 75/34 (2006.01); B65D 75/58 (2006.01); B65D 75/70 (2006.01); B67B 7/92 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 75/58 (2013.01); B65D 75/326 (2013.01); B65D 75/327 (2013.01); B65D 2575/3227 (2013.01); B65D 2575/3254 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 2919713 A1 19801120 - ZANKER HELMUT

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IE IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0075037 A1 20001214; AU 5065800 A 20001228; CA 2375178 A1 20001214; DE 59905747 D1 20030703; EP 1065152 A1 20010103; EP 1065152 B1 20030528; EP 1232101 A1 20020821; JP 2003501320 A 20030114; MX PA01012071 A 20030630

INPADOC legal status

2005-06-02 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050602

2005-04-08 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2005-03-09 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

2005-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2005-02-08 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2005-02-01 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2005-01-19 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

2005-01-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050101

2004-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-03 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040603

2004-06-02 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040602

2004-06-02 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040602

2004-05-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040302

2004-04-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-07-04 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030704

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-07-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59905747

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-07-03

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-07-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

2003-07-01 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030701

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-06-27 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030627

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-06-25 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2003-06-20 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030620

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-06-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030618

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-06-03 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2003-06-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030602

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-05-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-05-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IE IT LI SE

2003-05-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: SI

2003-05-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-02-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020107

2001-11-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALCAN TECHNOLOGY & MANAGEMENT AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-09-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE FR GB IE IT LI SE

2001-09-19 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AXX

- Free Format Text: SI PAYMENT 20010703

2001-09-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010703

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IE IT LI SE

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI