Global Patent Index - EP 1065160 A1

EP 1065160 A1 2001-01-03 - Device for separating flat objects

Title (en)

Device for separating flat objects

Title (de)

Einrichtung zum Vereinzeln von flachen Gegenständen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour séparer des objects plats

Publication

EP 1065160 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99810562 A

Priority

EP 99810562 A

Abstract (en)

The system for separating individual flat items (2) from a stack on an endless conveyor (1) comprises a gripping component (3) mounted on a carriage (4) which takes the front item (2a) from the first stack and moves it across the belt at right angles to its direction of motion (12). Bars (5, 6) mounted on the carriage detect the position of the front item and controllers (17) control the movement of the carriage to raise sloping articles (2b).

Abstract (de)

Die Einrichtung weist ein umlaufendes Förderorgan (3) auf, das am vorderen Stapelende das vorderste Versandstück (2a) flachseitig erfasst und quer zur Stapelbildungsrichtung (12) in einer Abzugsebene (A) abträgt. Eine das Förderorgan (3) aufweisende Fördervorrichtung (4) ist zur Anpassung des Förderorgans (3) an das Stapelmass hubartig versetzbar angetrieben. Die Einrichtung weist Mittel (5, 6) zum Erkennen der Versandstücklage am vordersten Stapelende auf. Entsprechend der Versandstücklage werden die Stapel (2) durch Hubbewegungen der Fördervorrichtung (4) aufgestellt. Die genannten Mittel sind vorzugsweise durch mehrere Taster (5, 6) gebildet, die bei entsprechenden Schwenklage ein Signal an eine Steuervorrichtung (17) abgeben. Es ist eine höhere Leistung bei wenigen Doppelabzügen möglich. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 1/24; B65H 1/14; B65H 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 1/02 (2006.01); B65H 1/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 1/025 (2013.01); B65H 1/24 (2013.01); B65H 31/3072 (2013.01); B65H 2301/42265 (2013.01); B65H 2404/232 (2013.01); B65H 2511/214 (2013.01); B65H 2511/242 (2013.01); B65H 2513/40 (2013.01); B65H 2701/1916 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. B65H 2511/214 + B65H 2220/01
  2. B65H 2511/242 + B65H 2220/01
  3. B65H 2513/40 + B65H 2220/02 + B65H 2220/11

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1065160 A1 20010103; EP 1065160 B1 20030820; DE 59906683 D1 20030925

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080630

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080628

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080628

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090101

2009-04-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090228

2009-02-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080628

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070629

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070626

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070607

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-08-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070822

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-08-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040524

2004-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-09-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59906683 P 20030925

2003-09-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-08-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-08-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2003-08-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-03-19 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: DEVICE FOR SEPARATING FLAT OBJECTS

2003-02-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2002-10-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020827

2001-09-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-05-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010319

2001-05-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG (SIEMENS SUISSE SA) (SIEMENS SV

2001-04-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI