Global patent index - EP 1065165 A2

EP 1065165 A2 2001-01-03 - Lighting for escalators or moving walkways

Title (en)

Lighting for escalators or moving walkways

Title (de)

Beleuchtung von Fahrtreppen oder Fahrsteigen

Title (fr)

Eclairage pour escaliers ou tapis roulants

Publication

EP 1065165 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00112318 A

Priority

DE 29911222 U

Abstract (en)

The moving staircase (10) or ramp has a balustrade with an illumination device (14), which emits light along at least part of the balustrade via a series of light-emitting diodes that are evenly spaced apart, e.g. a light-emitting diode band with a width of at least one light-emitting diode.

Abstract (de)

Eine Fahrtreppe oder ein Fahrsteig ist mit einer Balustrade versehen, die eine Beleuchtungsvorrichtung aufweist, die mindestens über einen Teil der Balustrade Licht emittiert. Die Beleuchtungsvorrichtung (14) ist durch eine Mehrfachanordnung, insbesondere eine Reihenanordung von Leuchtdioden gebildet. Diese sind im wesentlichen im gleichen Abstand zueinander angeordnet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66B 23/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 23/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 23/225 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 29911222 U1 19990930; EP 1065165 A2 20010103; EP 1065165 A3 20020814

INPADOC legal status

2005-04-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040928

2004-05-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040317

2003-05-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB

2002-12-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20021014

2002-08-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-08-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI