Global Patent Index - EP 1065166 A2

EP 1065166 A2 2001-01-03 - Telescopic crane

Title (en)

Telescopic crane

Title (de)

Teleskopkran

Title (fr)

Grue téléscopique

Publication

EP 1065166 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00250210 A

Priority

  • DE 19930537 A
  • DE 10022658 A

Abstract (en)

A jib is fitted with one or more bracing supports (2) tilted towards a rocking level that link to a tension device (6,7) running along the jib. The bracing support's angle of tilt is selected in such a way that the lateral load having an impact on the jib is taken up partially or completely by bracing.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Teleskopkran bestehend aus einem Unterwagen, einem drehbar darauf angeordneten Oberwagen, einem Gegengewicht und einem Ausleger, der mindestens einen Hauptausleger mit einem Grundkasten und mindestens einen darin ein- und ausschiebbaren Teleskopschuss aufweist. Erfindungsgemäß ist am Ausleger mindestens eine zumindest gegenüber der Wippebene geneigte Abspannstütze (2) angeordnet, die mit einem im Wesentlichen in Längsrichtung des Auslegers verlaufenden Spannmittel (6,7) verbunden ist, wobei die Neigung der Abspannstütze (2) so gewählt ist, dass die auf den Ausleger wirkende seitliche Belastung teilweise oder vollständig durch die Abspannung aufgenommen wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66C 23/82

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66C 23/18 (2006.01); B66C 23/42 (2006.01); B66C 23/687 (2006.01); B66C 23/82 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66C 23/828 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1065166 A2 20010103; EP 1065166 A3 20020508; EP 1065166 B1 20030813; EP 1065166 B2 20090218; AT 247071 T 20030815; AT 285980 T 20050115; DE 20022790 U1 20020704; DE 20023565 U1 20041125; ES 2204452 T3 20040501; ES 2235131 T3 20050701; JP 2001058791 A 20010306; JP 5013630 B2 20120829

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-22 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: TEREX GLOBAL GMBH, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: TEREX DEMAG GMBH, 66482 ZWEIBRUECKEN, DE

- Document: DE 50003246

2016-11-22 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50003246

- Representative's name: MOSER GOETZE & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE MBB, DE

2016-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160620

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-03-11 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50003246

- Representative's name: MOSER GOETZE & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE MBB, DE

2011-01-12 [REG NL SD] ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20101223

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070626

2009-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080630

2009-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090529

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080626

2009-05-06 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20090218

2009-05-06 [NLR3] NL: RECEIPT OF MODIFIED TRANSLATIONS IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AFTER AN OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

2009-04-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090228

2009-02-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080626

2009-02-18 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20090218

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2008-05-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: MANITOWOC CRANE GROUP GERMANY GMBH

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070615

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-03-19 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: MANITOWOC CRANE GROUP GERMANY GMBH

- Effective date: 20040223

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070621

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-08-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: MANITOWOC CRANE GROUP GERMANY GMBH

2007-06-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070628

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-05-23 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: MANITOWOC CRANE GROUP GERMANY GMBH

- Effective date: 20040223

2007-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060630

2006-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060630

2006-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060630

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-06-26 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060626

2005-09-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: DEUTSCHE GROVE GMBH

2005-07-20 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: DEUTSCHE GROVE GMBH

- Effective date: 20040223

2005-06-15 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20050615

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-06-14 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20050614

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *TEREX-DEMAG G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G.

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-26 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040626

2004-06-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: LIEBHERR-WERK EHINGEN GMBH

2004-06-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: DEUTSCHE GROVE GMBH

2004-05-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-05-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: LIEBHERR-WERK EHINGEN GMBH

2004-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2204452 T3

2004-04-14 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: LIEBHERR-WERK EHINGEN GMBH

- Effective date: 20040122

2004-04-14 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: DEUTSCHE GROVE GMBH

- Effective date: 20040223

2004-03-24 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-03-17 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: LIEBHERR-WERK EHINGEN GMBH

- Effective date: 20040122

2004-01-13 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040113

2003-12-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031209

2003-11-13 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031113

2003-11-13 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031113

2003-11-13 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031113

2003-09-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50003246 P 20030918

2003-09-17 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-08-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: DR. LUSUARDI AG

2003-08-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-08-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-08-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-08-13 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030813

2003-08-13 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030813

2003-08-13 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030813

2003-08-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: IRSCH, MICHAEL, DIPL.-ING.

2003-08-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: STOWASSER, WALTER, DIPL.-ING.

2003-08-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CONRAD, FRANK, DIPL.-ING.

2003-08-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FRIES, OLIVER, DR.-ING.

2003-08-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FERY, JENS, DIPL.-ING.

2003-08-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KUHN, ROLAND, DIPL.-ING.

2003-08-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ZIMMER, WALTER

2003-08-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MARX, MARKUS

2003-06-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TEREX-DEMAG GMBH & CO. KG

2003-01-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-08-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DEMAG MOBILE CRANES GMBH & CO. KG

2002-05-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-05-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011030

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI