Global Patent Index - EP 1065264 A1

EP 1065264 A1 2001-01-03 - Bleaching compositions

Title (en)

Bleaching compositions

Title (de)

Bleichmittelzusammensetzungen

Title (fr)

Compositions de blanchiment

Publication

EP 1065264 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99870134 A

Priority

EP 99870134 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention relates to a bleaching composition comprising a preformed mono peroxy carboxylic acid and a optical brightener wherein both the preformed mono peroxy acid and the insoluble optical brightener are stable.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/39; C11D 3/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06L 3/02 (2006.01); C11D 3/39 (2006.01); C11D 3/40 (2006.01); C11D 3/42 (2006.01); C11D 7/38 (2006.01); C11D 7/54 (2006.01); D06L 3/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/42 (2013.01); C11D 3/3945 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1065264 A1 20010103; AR 021447 A1 20020717; AU 5772900 A 20010131; BR 0012096 A 20020402; CA 2377351 A1 20010104; EP 1190033 A1 20020327; JP 2003503585 A 20030128; MX PA02000106 A 20020702; TR 200103807 T2 20020422; WO 0100773 A1 20010104

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040101

2004-04-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020425

2001-09-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2001-08-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010606

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI