Global Patent Index - EP 1065286 A1

EP 1065286 A1 2001-01-03 - Low aluminum steel sheet for cans

Title (en)

Low aluminum steel sheet for cans

Title (de)

Stahlband mit geringem Aluminiumgehalt für Behälter

Title (fr)

Tole d'acier à basse teneur en aluminium pour emballage

Publication

EP 1065286 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00401869 A

Priority

FR 9908419 A

Abstract (en)

Annealing of the steel strip comprises heating to a temperature above that of the onset of perlitic transformation Ac1, holding the temperature above this temperature for more than 10 s, rapid cooling to below 100 degrees C, at a rate exceeding 100 degrees C/s, low temperature treatment at 100 degrees C-300 degrees C for more than 10 s, and cooling to ambient temperature. Production of a low aluminum steel strip for manufacture of containers comprises: (a) providing a hot-rolled steel strip containing in (wt.%): 0.050-0.080 C; 0.25-0.40 Mn, 0.020 Al, 0.010-0.014 N, and the remainder iron and inevitable impurities; (b) primary cold rolling the strip; (c) annealing the cold rolled strip; and (d) secondary cold rolling. An Independent claim is included for steel strip of the above-specified composition which satisfies an equation relating ultimate elongation and ultimate tensile strength.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention a pour objet une tôle d'acier à basse teneur en aluminium comprenant en poids entre 0,050 et 0,080 % de carbone, entre 0,25 et 0,40 % de manganèse, moins de 0,020 % d'aluminium, entre 0,010 et 0,014% d'azote, le reste étant du fer et des impuretés résiduelles inévitables. L'acier comporte des atmosphères de COTTRELL et/ou des carbures epsilon précipités à basse température, et présente un nombre de grains par mm<2> supérieur à 30000 ainsi que, à l'état vieilli, un taux d'allongement A% satisfaisant la relation : (750 - Rm) / 16,5 <= A% <= (850 - Rm) / 17,5 Rm étant la résistance maximale à la rupture.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C21D 8/04; C21D 9/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C21D 8/04 (2006.01); C21D 9/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C21D 9/48 (2013.01); C21D 8/0436 (2013.01); C21D 8/0468 (2013.01); C21D 8/0473 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1065286 A1 20010103; EP 1065286 B1 20020821; AT 222607 T 20020915; BR 0002268 A 20010313; CA 2314177 A1 20010101; CA 2314177 C 20100420; DE 60000342 D1 20020926; DE 60000342 T2 20040513; DK 1065286 T3 20021223; ES 2180499 T3 20030216; FR 2795744 A1 20010105; FR 2795744 B1 20010803; PT 1065286 E 20021231; US 6974511 B1 20051213

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090611

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-04-13 [REG SE ECNC] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS BEEN CANCELLED

2010-03-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20090624

2010-01-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF THE APPLICANT RENOUNCES

- Effective date: 20020821

2010-01-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF THE APPLICANT RENOUNCES

- Effective date: 20020821

2009-12-23 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20090624

2009-12-23 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Effective date: 20090624

2009-12-04 [REG PT MP4A] REFUSAL OF NATIONAL PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20091130

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090626

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090624

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-11-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20090514

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-11-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20090720

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-11-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-10-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090615

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090709

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20090619

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20090615

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-08-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20090616

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090622

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-08-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20090625

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20090605

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-07-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20090615

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-07-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20090618

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-07-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20090603

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-09-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: CORUS STAAL BV

2003-07-16 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: CORUS STAAL BV

- Effective date: 20030521

2003-06-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-30 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2180499 T3

2002-12-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20021111

2002-12-23 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-12-19 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20020403665

2002-12-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021113

2002-10-02 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2002-09-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60000342 20020926

2002-08-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-08-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-08-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-08-21 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020821

2002-08-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 222607 T 20020915

2001-12-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011105

2001-09-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010703

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI