Global Patent Index - EP 1065307 A1

EP 1065307 A1 2001-01-03 - Manufacturing technology and equipment of vertically layered bulky textiles

Title (en)

Manufacturing technology and equipment of vertically layered bulky textiles

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung von vertikal abgelegten bauschigen Textilien

Title (fr)

Procédé de fabrication et équipement pour la formation de textiles volumineux à partir de couches positionnées verticalement

Publication

EP 1065307 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00113666 A

Priority

CZ 236699 A

Abstract (en)

The manufacturing process and equipment of bulky textile configurations by vertical layering of fabrics based on formation into folds vertical to product level and their pressing to a required density, where - according to the invention concept - in places of compacting of vertically layered bulky textiles to such a density, pressures forming flat fabric formation into folds cease to be applied by from place to place in jumps. The equipment for production of bulky textile configurations above consisting of fold forming body, which represents a rotating body (4) fitted with punches and identified by the fact that punch (2) containing bars (3) pass through radial grooves of discs (7) fixed to the driving shaft (11), which rotates the grooved discs (7) and, consequently, the bars (3) round the shaft (11) centre line and where the bars (3) are controlled by cams (8) influencing radially orientated movements of the bars (3).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04H 1/74

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04H 1/70 (2006.01); D04H 1/74 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01G 25/00 (2013.01); D04H 1/74 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1065307 A1 20010103; CZ 291338 B6 20030212; CZ 9902366 A3 20020814

INPADOC legal status


2008-06-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080101

2001-11-28 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2001-09-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-19 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20010703;LT PAYMENT 20010703;LV PAYMENT 20010703;MK PAYMENT 20010703;RO PAYMENT 20010703;SI PAYMENT 20010703

2001-08-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010703

2001-02-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KRCMA, RADKO

2001-02-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HANUS, JAROSLAV

2001-02-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: JIRSAK, OLDRICH

2001-02-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KOLCAVA, LUDEK

2001-02-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KOTEK, VACLAV

2001-02-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MACHOVA, IVA

2001-02-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SANETRNIK, FILIP

2001-02-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: VITAK, JOSEF

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI