Global Patent Index - EP 1065313 A2

EP 1065313 A2 2001-01-03 - Device for separating and threading a web tail

Title (en)

Device for separating and threading a web tail

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Trennen und Überführen eines Einführstreifens

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour séparer et enfiler la bande directrice

Publication

EP 1065313 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00107676 A

Priority

DE 19929927 A

Abstract (en)

The appts. (10) to cut a leader strip (12) at a web of paper or cardboard, for feeding into papermaking or paper finishing machine stages, has a cutter (16) and a transfer unit (18) to carry it to a following machine stage. The cutter (16) and transfer unit (18) are pref. mounted to a common plate (22). Before cutting, the leader strip (12) is passed to the plate (22), to be tensed for cutting, with the transfer unit (18) in front of the cutter (16) in the direction (L) of material travel. The plate (22) is mounted at a scraper beam (24). The transfer unit is an air transfer unit (18). Before cutting, the leader strip (12) is stabilized by a blown air stream at the side of the plate (22) towards the leader strip (12), at a tangent. An air guide plate (30) is after the cutter (16), in the direction (L) of travel, to apply tension to the leader strip (12), at the side of the plate (22) towards the leader (12). The air guide plate (30) is pitched at an angle to the plate (22) surface so that the leader (12) is lifted from the plate (22) surface to pass through the cutting zone of the cutter (16). At least two air guide plates (30) can be fitted, in succession on the direction (L) of paper travel. The air transfer unit (18) has a number of blowing jets, with adjustment movement. It can have a blowing tube, with a row of blower jets parallel to the tube axis, with at least some which can be adjusted, and the blowing tube can be set by rotation around its axis. Adjustable jets at the air transfer system can be used to stabilize and/or tense the leader (12). The cutter (16) gives a shear cut and/or a parallel cut. The cutter (16) has at least two cutting blades, with a setting screw adjustment at two frame sections which swing in relation to each other. The cutting blades are smooth or they can be perforated and/or toothed.

Abstract (de)

Eine Vorrichtung 10 zum Trennen und Überführen eines in eine Maschine zur Herstellung und/oder Behandlung einer Materialbahn, insbesondere Papier- oder Kartonbahn, einzufädelnden Einführstreifens 12 umfaßt eine Trenneinrichtung 16 und eine Überführeinrichtung 18, die dazu dient, den Einführstreifen 12 nach erfolgter Trennung zu einer nachfolgenden Einrichtung 20 der Maschine zu überführen. Die Trenneinrichtung 16 und die Überführeinrichtung 18 sind vorzugsweise auf einer gemeinsamen Platte 22 angebracht, auf der der Einführstreifen 12 vor dem Trennen geführt und für den Trennvorgang vorspannbar ist. Dabei ist die Überführeinrichtung 18 in Streifenlaufrichtung L vor der Trenneinrichtung 16 angeordnet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21G 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21G 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21G 9/0072 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1065313 A2 20010103; EP 1065313 A3 20010411; EP 1065313 B1 20060705; DE 19929927 A1 20010104; DE 50013110 D1 20060817; US 6394331 B1 20020528

INPADOC legal status


2014-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121101

2013-02-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50013110

- Effective date: 20121101

2011-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110421

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090411

2010-01-29 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090410

2009-12-15 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2008-10-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20080414

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-09-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20080415

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-06-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070410

2006-10-24 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2006-09-13 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: VOITH PATENT GMBH

2006-08-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50013110 P 20060817

2006-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE

2005-08-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050621

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FI SE

2001-12-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011011

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI