Global Patent Index - EP 1065313 A3

EP 1065313 A3 2001-04-11 - Device for separating and threading a web tail

Title (en)

Device for separating and threading a web tail

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Trennen und Überführen eines Einführstreifens

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour séparer et enfiler la bande directrice

Publication

EP 1065313 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00107676 A

Priority

DE 19929927 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1065313A2] The appts. (10) to cut a leader strip (12) at a web of paper or cardboard, for feeding into papermaking or paper finishing machine stages, has a cutter (16) and a transfer unit (18) to carry it to a following machine stage. The cutter (16) and transfer unit (18) are pref. mounted to a common plate (22). Before cutting, the leader strip (12) is passed to the plate (22), to be tensed for cutting, with the transfer unit (18) in front of the cutter (16) in the direction (L) of material travel. The plate (22) is mounted at a scraper beam (24). The transfer unit is an air transfer unit (18). Before cutting, the leader strip (12) is stabilized by a blown air stream at the side of the plate (22) towards the leader strip (12), at a tangent. An air guide plate (30) is after the cutter (16), in the direction (L) of travel, to apply tension to the leader strip (12), at the side of the plate (22) towards the leader (12). The air guide plate (30) is pitched at an angle to the plate (22) surface so that the leader (12) is lifted from the plate (22) surface to pass through the cutting zone of the cutter (16). At least two air guide plates (30) can be fitted, in succession on the direction (L) of paper travel. The air transfer unit (18) has a number of blowing jets, with adjustment movement. It can have a blowing tube, with a row of blower jets parallel to the tube axis, with at least some which can be adjusted, and the blowing tube can be set by rotation around its axis. Adjustable jets at the air transfer system can be used to stabilize and/or tense the leader (12). The cutter (16) gives a shear cut and/or a parallel cut. The cutter (16) has at least two cutting blades, with a setting screw adjustment at two frame sections which swing in relation to each other. The cutting blades are smooth or they can be perforated and/or toothed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21G 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21G 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21G 9/0072 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1065313 A2 20010103; EP 1065313 A3 20010411; EP 1065313 B1 20060705; DE 19929927 A1 20010104; DE 50013110 D1 20060817; US 6394331 B1 20020528

INPADOC legal status


2014-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121101

2013-02-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 50013110

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20121101

2011-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110421

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090411

2010-01-29 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090410

2009-12-15 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2008-10-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080414

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-09-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080415

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-06-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20070410

2006-10-24 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2006-09-13 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: VOITH PATENT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2006-08-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50013110

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2006-08-17

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE

2005-08-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20050621

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FI SE

2001-12-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20011011

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI