Global Patent Index - EP 1065314 A1

EP 1065314 A1 2001-01-03 - Process for making paper products

Title (en)

Process for making paper products

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung von Papierprodukten

Title (fr)

Procédé de fabrication de produits papetiers

Publication

EP 1065314 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00401639 A

Priority

FR 9908482 A

Abstract (en)

During the prodn. stages for a paper material, using a fraction of recycled paper pulp, the acidification stage uses an injection of carbon dioxide into the pulp suspension at a point where the fractions are in the process circuit between the outlet of the pulper (15) for the used paper fraction and the mixing point where the pulp is mixed with fresh pulp. The second stage dilutes the pulp in at least two phases, using clean water which has been injected with carbon dioxide. The clean water is recovered from the papermaking machine or from an external supply such as from the pulp preparation stage and/or cleaned water recovered from other stages. The carbon dioxide is injected pref. at two points in the fraction treatment circuit, on leaving the pulper for the fractions and the end point of the treatment process. The second fraction processing stage has at least one phase where lumps are broken down and/or at least one complementary cleaning phase for the pulp delivered by the pulper (15). The first injection of carbon dioxide is to set the pH at an intermediate level for the grinding and/or cleaning phases. The second injection gives the diluted pulp a pH compatible with the pH level in force during the mixing stage (2). The diluted pulp has a pH value of 5.5-8.5 from the fraction treatment, and the intermediate pH value of the pulp during grinding and/or cleaning is 7.5-9.0 and pref. 8.0-8.5. The carbon dioxide is injected into one and/or more of the points of: Into the clean water used to dilute the fractions (18); into the clean water (20) for dilution at the outlet of the fraction pulper (15); into the clean water for final dilution of the fraction mixed with fresh pulp; into the pulp fraction on leaving the pulper (15) and before the following stages; or into the pulp fraction at the end of the processing but before mixing with fresh pulp. The carbon dioxide is fed by an initial dilution water feed on leaving the pulper to give a pH value of 7.5-9.0 and pref. 8.0-8.5 to the level at the grinder, and by a second dilution water feed between the grinder and the final stage to give a pH value for the diluted pulp equal to the level in force at the pulp mixing stage, where the fraction is mixed with the remainder of the cellulose pulp. The carbon dioxide is fed as a gas or a liquid, or partially a gas and partially a liquid.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne un procédé de fabrication d'un produit papetier à partir de pâte cellulosique dont une partie provient de cassés, lesdits cassés ayant subi un traitement dit traitement des cassés comprenant : une première étape consistant en une remise en solution sous agitation et en milieu alcalin des fibres cellulosiques contenues dans lesdits cassés, ladite étape étant réalisée dans un pulpeur dit pulpeur à cassés (15). puis une deuxième étape, destinée à amener la pâte issue dudit pulpeur (15) à une concentration et à un pH voisin de ceux de la pâte neuve contenue dans le cuvier de mélange (2), ladite deuxième étape comprenant au moins une étape de dilution par des eaux blanches du procédé et au moins une étape d'acidification réalisée par injection de CO2 gazeux ou liquide en au moins un point du circuit de traitement des cassés situé entre la sortie du pulpeur à cassés (15) et le mélange de la pâte issue du traitement des cassés avec la pâte neuve. Le procédé est avantageusement mis en oeuvre en introduisant le CO2 dans les eaux blanches servant à diluer la pâte issue du traitement en milieu basique des cassés. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21H 17/65; D21H 11/14; D21H 23/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21H 11/14 (2006.01); D21H 17/65 (2006.01); D21H 23/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21H 11/14 (2013.01); D21H 17/65 (2013.01); D21H 23/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1065314 A1 20010103; EP 1065314 B1 20070606; AT 364107 T 20070615; BR 0002954 A 20010403; CA 2311279 A1 20010101; DE 60035084 D1 20070719; DE 60035084 T2 20080131; ES 2286991 T3 20071216; FR 2795753 A1 20010105; FR 2795753 B1 20010914; PT 1065314 E 20070806

INPADOC legal status


2011-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF THE APPLICANT RENOUNCES

- Effective date: 20070606

2011-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF THE APPLICANT RENOUNCES

- Effective date: 20070606

2011-10-25 [REG SE ECNC] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS BEEN CANCELLED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ECNC

2011-10-20 [REG DE R107] PUBLICATION OF GRANT OF EUROPEAN PATENT RESCINDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: R107

- Ref Document Number: 60035084

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20111020

2011-08-17 [27W] REVOKED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27W

- Effective date: 20110411

2011-08-17 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPR

- Effective date: 20110411

2011-08-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2011-08-11 [REG PT MP4A] REFUSAL OF NATIONAL PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: MP4A

- Effective date: 20110809

2011-04-11 [REG DE R064] EPO'S REVOCATION DECISION NOW FINAL

- Ref Legal Event Code: R064

- Ref Document Number: 60035084

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2011-04-11 [REG DE R103] PATENT REVOKED BY EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: R103

- Ref Document Number: 60035084

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2010-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100625

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100618

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100614

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-10-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100611

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-10-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100623

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100614

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100626

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-07-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100623

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-07-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100615

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-07-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100706

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-07-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100604

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070609

2009-07-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070606

2008-04-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070606

2008-04-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070907

2008-04-16 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: LINDE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Effective date: 20080306

2008-01-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070630

2008-01-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070606

2008-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070606

2008-01-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

2007-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2286991

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2007-12-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2007-09-11 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2007-09-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20070815

2007-09-03 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLT2

- Effective date: 20070627

2007-08-06 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20070725

2007-07-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60035084

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2007-07-19

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2007-07-11 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: FRENCH

2007-06-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2007-06-27 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'E

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2007-06-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2007-06-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-04-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'E

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2004-03-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: L'AIR LIQUIDE, S.A. AE DIRECTOIRE ET CONSEIL DE SU

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-09-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010703

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI