Global Patent Index - EP 1065319 A1

EP 1065319 A1 2001-01-03 - Vegetation wall and process for its erection

Title (en)

Vegetation wall and process for its erection

Title (de)

Begrünbare Wand und Herstellungsverfahren derselben

Title (fr)

Paroi fertilisable et procédé d'érection de ladite paroi

Publication

EP 1065319 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00500134 A

Priority

ES 9901453 A

Abstract (en)

Vegetation wall and process of use thereof. The invention is comprised by variable formworks (1) of tiers (height) and slope arranged one on top of the other and closed. Inside them the filler is placed. Closure is achieved on the basis of geosynthetics, in the front part as vegetation support (7) and in the lower part of the formwork anchored to the same and in the middle of the filter tier, in this case, by means of a biaxial geonet. The system is interlocking and is completed with a vegetable covering on the outside front. Of application in the contention and covering of bowled floors, of civil and public works (routes, highways, railways, etc.). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02D 29/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02D 29/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02D 29/0241 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

ES 2023736 A6 19920201 - CORREL ELEMENTOS CORTANTES LDA [PT]

Citation (search report)

Citation (third parties)

Third party :

  • "CONSTRUCTION", GREEN WALL PROJEKT, 1997, XP002956747
  • JONES C.J.F.P.: "Earth reinforcement & soil structures", 1996, THOMAS TELFORD, ISBN: 0-7277-2525-4, pages: 246 - 248, XP002976626
  • "TEXTOMUR - SYSTEM Manual", June 1996, NAEFELS, ST.GALLEN AN HERISAU, pages: 3.13 - 3.14, XP002976627

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1065319 A1 20010103; ES 2179710 A1 20030116; ES 2179710 B1 20040401

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-30 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040927

2003-04-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030220

2001-09-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-19 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20000623;LT PAYMENT 20000623;LV PAYMENT 20000623;MK PAYMENT 20000623;RO PAYMENT 20000623;SI PAYMENT 20000623

2001-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010619

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20000623;LT PAYMENT 20000623;LV PAYMENT 20000623;MK PAYMENT 20000623;RO PAYMENT 20000623;SI PAYMENT 20000623