Global patent index - EP 1065321 A2

EP 1065321 A2 2001-01-03 - Device for the fixing of a sanitary fitting to a kitchen sink

Title (en)

Device for the fixing of a sanitary fitting to a kitchen sink

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Befestigung einer Armatur an einer Küchenspüle

Title (fr)

Dispositif de connexion d'un robinet à un évier

Publication

EP 1065321 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00113605 A

Priority

DE 29910869 U

Abstract (en)

The stopper (1) is cylindrical with a lower end of reduced diameter. The shoulder at the bottom of the cylindrical portion has a groove containing an O-ring seal which presses against the bottom of the sink (2). The portion (5), which extends down through the hole, has an external thread (4), which may accommodate a drainpipe, and there is a rotatable fastening (6), e.g. a bayonet lock which presses a locking disc (14) up against the bottom surface of the sink.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Armatur (1) zur Befestigung an einer Küchenspüle (2), bei der ein mit Gewinde versehener Schaft (5) der Armatur durch ein Loch (3) an der Küchenspüle (2) verläuft, sowie eine entsprechende Küchenspüle. Bei der Armatur sind Fixierelemente (6) vorgesehen, die mit einer bajonettartigen Verriegelung (9) an der Spüle zusammenwirken. Sowohl die Armatur (1) als auch die Spüle (2) sind dabei gleichzeitig so ausgebildet, dass auch eine konventionelle Befestigung mittels einer Mutter möglich ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03C 1/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E03C 1/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03C 1/0401 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29910869 U1 20001123; EP 1065321 A2 20010103; EP 1065321 A3 20021218

INPADOC legal status

2004-03-31 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-10-16 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2003-09-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-12-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI