Global patent index - EP 1065322 A1

EP 1065322 A1 2001-01-03 - Rail holder

Title (en)

Rail holder

Title (de)

Stangenhalter

Title (fr)

Support de barre

Publication

EP 1065322 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00305337 A

Priority

GB 9915337 A

Abstract (en)

A rail holder (10) for mounting the end of a rail with respect to a surface, the rail holder comprising: a main body (20) to be clamped to the surface and for holding the end of the rail; and a clamping member (30) for clamping the main body to the surface using a fastener (40) extending into the surface, the clamping member having an aperture (31) for the fastener to pass through, the aperture being elongated in a first direction so that the clamping member may be selectively positionable along the first direction with respect to the fastener and the clamping member fitting to the main body such that the clamping member is guided to be positionable substantially along a second direction with respect to the main body, the second direction being different to the first. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03C 1/06; A47K 17/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47K 17/02 (2006.01); E03C 1/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47K 17/022 (2013.01); E03C 1/06 (2013.01); A47K 2201/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1065322 A1 20010103; EP 1065322 B1 20040317; DE 60008968 D1 20040422; DE 60008968 T2 20050210; GB 2351525 A 20010103; GB 2351525 B 20021224; GB 9915337 D0 19990901

INPADOC legal status

2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120702

2013-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130101

2013-04-18 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 60008968

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130101

2013-03-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20130228

2013-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120623

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110615

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110621

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-07-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110621

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-03-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20041220

2004-11-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-04-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60008968

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-04-22

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-03-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2001-09-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR IT

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010117

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI