Global Patent Index - EP 1065323 A1

EP 1065323 A1 2001-01-03 - Device for the total or partial flushing of a toilet tank

Title (en)

Device for the total or partial flushing of a toilet tank

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Ganz- oder Teilmengenentleerung eines Toilettenspülkastens

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour vidange totale ou partielle d'une quantité d'eau pour réservoirs de chasse d'eau

Publication

EP 1065323 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99202161 A

Priority

EP 99202161 A

Abstract (en)

It is a double flushing device for toilets, which gives the user the possibility to choose between partial flushing and total flushing in order to correctly clean the toilet, without the need to interrupt the flushing while same is taken place. The operation of the device is carried out by means of a double push operating element (11) that is connected to a swivel-mounted mechanism (13) connected in turn to an overflow (1) belonging to the flushing assembly. It should be pointed out that the partial flushing is advantageously adjustable. The device of the invention, unlike other conventional devices, proves to be a simple relatively inexpensive device, which additionally operates in a fully correct manner. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03D 1/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E03D 1/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03D 1/142 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB GR IT PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1065323 A1 20010103

INPADOC legal status


2004-10-20 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20040831

2004-01-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20031128

2001-09-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB GR IT PT

2001-08-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010629

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB GR IT PT

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI