Global Patent Index - EP 1065325 A2

EP 1065325 A2 2001-01-03 - Sealing strip for sealing a joint

Title (en)

Sealing strip for sealing a joint

Title (de)

Dichtungsband zum Abdichten einer Fuge

Title (fr)

Bande d'étanchéité pour étanchéifier un joint

Publication

EP 1065325 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00810553 A

Priority

DE 29911258 U

Abstract (en)

The sealing band (1) has a support substrate (2) on whose at least one side (3a,3b) a waterproof coating is provided in such a way that two side sections (5,6) remain uncoated. On at least one side of the sealing band an uncoated edge strip (8a,8b) is provided. The sealing band has a length of approximately 3 m.

Abstract (de)

Ein Dichtungsband (1) zum Abdichten von Fugen in Bauwerken, besteht im wesentlichen aus einem Trägersubstrat (2), auf welchem wenigstens auf einer Seite (3, 3b) eine wasserdichte Beschichtung (4a, 4b) so vorgesehen ist, dass zwei seitliche, unbeschichtete Randstreifen (5a, 5b; 6a, 6b) gebildet werden. An wenigstens einer Querseite (7) des Dichtungsbandes ist ausserdem ein unbeschichteter Quer-Randstreifen (8a, 8b) vorgesehen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 1/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/6809 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29911258 U1 19991007; EP 1065325 A2 20010103; EP 1065325 A3 20030122

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030723

2003-11-13 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-10-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-01-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-01-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI