Global Patent Index - EP 1065328 A1

EP 1065328 A1 2001-01-03 - Sealing cap

Title (en)

Sealing cap

Title (de)

Abdeckkappenvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de capot

Publication

EP 1065328 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00112932 A

Priority

DE 29911503 U

Abstract (en)

The end cover (10.1) has a sectional recess (14) running along the section (12) longitudinal direction (13), with plates (20.1) that cover the end (11) of the section. The plates and first clamp (22.1) make a continuous recess (26) in which a second clamp (28.1) is securely fixed. A contour (30.1) connects a tool in a fixed position for releasing the second clamp. The cover is made from a plastic material.

Abstract (de)

Eine Abdeckkappenvorrichtung (10.1) für den Stirnendbereich (11) von stranggepressten Profilen (12) mit einer in Profillängsrichtung (13) verlaufenden Profilausnehmung (14) mit einer Platteneinrichtung (20.1), die im aufgesetzten Zustand den Stirnendbereich (11) des Profils (12) abdeckt, und einer ersten Klemmeinrichtung (22.1), die als in die Profilausnehmung (14) einführbare Vorsprungeinrichtung (24) ausgebildet ist, wobei die Platteneinrichtung (20.1) und die erste Klemmeinrichtung (22.1) einstückig aus Kunststoff ausgebildet sind, ist dadurch gekennzeichnet, dass die Platteneinrichtung (20.1) und die erste Klemmeinrichtung (22.1) eine durchgehende Ausnehmung aufweist, in die eine zweite Klemmeinrichtung (28.1) klemmend einschlagbar ist, wodurch sich die in die Ausnehmung (14) eingeführte erste Klemmeinrichtung (22.1) in der Profilausnehmung (14) verklemmt und an der zweiten Klemmeinrichtung (28.1) eine Formkontur (30.1) zum Anschluss eines Werkzeuges in eingeschlagenem Zustand zum Lösen der zweiten Klemmeinrichtung (28.1) vorhanden ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 2/78

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04C 3/06 (2006.01); E04C 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04C 3/06 (2013.01); E04C 2003/0421 (2013.01); E04C 2003/0439 (2013.01); E04C 2003/0465 (2013.01); E04C 2003/0478 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29911503 U1 19990923; EP 1065328 A1 20010103

INPADOC legal status


2004-11-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040525

2004-02-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040112

2001-09-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010323

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI