Global patent index - EP 1065331 A1

EP 1065331 A1 2001-01-03 - Roof verge tile

Title (en)

Roof verge tile

Title (de)

Dachortgangziegel

Title (fr)

Tuile à rabat latéral

Publication

EP 1065331 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00420136 A

Priority

FR 9908589 A

Abstract (en)

The roofing edge tile consists of a standard flat tile (2) with grooves (6, 7) along the upper surface of one edge and the lower surface of the other. The tile can be fitted with side plates (8, 18) to go over the edges of a roof, each side plate being shaped to engage with one edge of the tile. Each of the side plates has an in-turned upper edge (10, 20), one with a rib (12) on its underside to engage with a groove (6) in the upper surface of the tile edge and a projection (14) to engage with a groove (15) in the underside of the tile; the other has a slider (22) with a raised edge to engage with a groove (7) in the under surface of the tile.

Abstract (fr)

Cette tuile comprend une tuile à emboîtement (2) de type connu en soi, et comportant en outre, le long de l'un de ses bords longitudinaux, au moins une rainure (6) tournée vers le haut et débouchant au moins à son extrémité inférieure et, le long de son autre bord longitudinal, au moins une nervure (7) tournée vers le bas et débouchant au moins à son extrémité supérieure, et deux rabats distincts (8, 18) convenant respectivement pour un rabat à droite ou un rabat à gauche comportant chacun un retour plan (10, 20) d'appui sur une tuile et un système de glissière pour la fixation sur les rainures (6) et nervures (7) de la tuile. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04D 1/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04D 1/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04D 1/30 (2013.01); E04D 2001/302 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1065331 A1 20010103; FR 2795757 A1 20010105; FR 2795757 B1 20010803; PL 341021 A1 20010102

INPADOC legal status

2006-02-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20050822

2004-06-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040505

2001-10-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: IMERYS TOITURE

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-09-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010312

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI