Global Patent Index - EP 1065332 A1

EP 1065332 A1 2001-01-03 - Quarter-or half-spiral stairways

Title (en)

Quarter-or half-spiral stairways

Title (de)

Viertel- und halbgewendelte Treppen

Title (fr)

Escaliers hélicoidaux à quart-ou demi-tour

Publication

EP 1065332 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00105774 A

Priority

DE 29911369 U

Abstract (en)

The stair case is made from reinforced steel (1). The staircase is provided with side walls (2) or supports (3) which are directly connected. The walls may also be made of reinforced concrete.

Abstract (de)

Vorgefertigte viertel- bzw. halbgewendelte Treppen (1) aus Stahlbeton, die mit Seitenwänden (2) oder Stützen (3) verbunden sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04F 11/022

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04F 11/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04F 11/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE FR NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 29911369 U1 19990916; EP 1065332 A1 20010103

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031001

2001-11-08 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-10-04 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE FR NL

2001-09-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY LI

2001-08-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010628

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE FR NL

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI