Global patent index - EP 1065337 A2

EP 1065337 A2 2001-01-03 - Corner joint for a fitting assembly

Title (en)

Corner joint for a fitting assembly

Title (de)

Eckverbindung für ein Beschlagsystem

Title (fr)

Joint d'angle pour ensemble de ferrure

Publication

EP 1065337 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00112070 A

Priority

DE 29911235 U

Abstract (en)

A method for fitting the corner joints of an interior frame inside a window, e.g. a twist and tilt window system, has a coupling (10) fitted to the vertical section (13) of the frame and a second coupling (66) fitted to the horizontal section (60) of the frame. The first coupling has a sprung ratchet grip (48), which grips the shaped end (64) of the second coupling for a clip fastening which does not require any separate fasteners. The first coupling has a shaped inlet jaw (46), which guides the tag (64) of the second coupling into the coupling position. The tag has a slot into which the sprung grip drops.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine lösbare Eckverbindung zwischen einem ersten Beschlagteil und einem zweiten Beschlagteil eines Beschlagsystems für Schwenkflügel oder Schwenkkippflügel von Fenstern, Türen oder dergleichen. Die Eckverbindung weist zum Verbinden der beiden Beschlagteile am ersten Beschlagteil ein Hakenelement auf, das mit einer am zweiten Beschlagteil ausgebildeten Ausnehmung in Eingriff bringbar ist. Das Hakenelement ist als federnder Rasthaken ausgebildet, der zum miteinander Verbinden der beiden Beschlagteile mit der Ausnehmung verrastbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05C 9/24; E05C 9/22; E05F 7/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/24 (2006.01); E05F 7/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 15/5208 (2013.01); E05D 15/522 (2013.01); E05Y 2600/53 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/20 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/205 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/148 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE FR IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 29911235 U1 20000817; EP 1065337 A2 20010103; EP 1065337 A3 20041110; PL 203099 B1 20090831; PL 340993 A1 20010102

INPADOC legal status

2015-10-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20150519

2012-04-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MACO TECHNOLOGIE GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2010-03-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MACO VERMOEGENSVERWALTUNG GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2008-03-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20080208

2005-07-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR IT NL

2005-07-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20050504

2004-11-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-11-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI