Global Patent Index - EP 1065341 A2

EP 1065341 A2 2001-01-03 - Locker arrangement

Title (en)

Locker arrangement

Title (de)

Schliessfachanlage

Title (fr)

Agencement de coffres multiples

Publication

EP 1065341 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00112476 A

Priority

DE 19930175 A

Abstract (en)

The locker unit has several lockers (39) arranged next to each other or on top of one another, which each have access units (14). Each locker has a transmitter unit (40) for radio signals, which uses the metal outer parts of the locker as an antenna. The access units, doors (22), locks, frame parts, walls bases or covers or door knobs or pulls may form the radio antennae. The transmitters automatically transmit an alarm if disturbed.

Abstract (de)

Eine Schließfachanlage mit mehreren Neben- und/oder übereinander angeordneten Schließfächern weist erfindungsgemäß je Schließfach eine Sendeeinrichtung auf zur drahtlosen Übertragung von Signalen. Damit kann ein Begleiten von Kunden eines Kreditinstitutes durch Mitarbeiter des Kreditinstitutes in den die Schließfachanlage enthaltenden Tresorraum entfallen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05G 1/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05G 1/08 (2006.01); E05G 1/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05G 1/10 (2013.01); E05G 1/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1065341 A2 20010103; EP 1065341 A3 20020116; DE 19930175 A1 20010104

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040527

2003-04-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030221

2002-10-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DE ES NL

2002-08-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: LEICHER PROJEKT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-07-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020522

2002-01-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES NL

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI