Global patent index - EP 1065342 A2

EP 1065342 A2 2001-01-03 - Glazed door

Title (en)

Glazed door

Title (de)

Glastür

Title (fr)

Porte vitrée

Publication

EP 1065342 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00113151 A

Priority

DE 29911500 U

Abstract (en)

The glass pane (3) surrounded by the wooden or metal door frame (1) is fixed to the frame. At least two parallel glass panes are spaced apart by at least one spacer piece (5) in the form of strips to form at least one double-glazed panel. The outer sides of the glass panes lead into the outer sides of the door frame. The glass panes are stuck to the spacer piece by use of a double sided adhesive strip (7). The spacer strips are screwed to the door frame from the end side facing the space between (11) the glass panes.

Abstract (de)

Eine Glastür mit wenigstens einer Glasscheibe (3), einem Türrahmen (1), der die Glasscheibe (3) umgibt und an dem die Glasscheibe (3) befestigt ist, ist dadurch gekennzeichnet, daß wenigstens zwei durch wenigstens einen Abstandhalter (5) voneinander beabstandete parallele Glasscheiben (3) zur Bildung wenigstens einer Doppelverglasung vorgesehen sind und daß die Außenseiten der Glasscheiben (3) bündig in die Außenseiten des Türrahmens (1) übergehen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 3/70; E06B 3/64

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/54 (2006.01); E06B 3/58 (2006.01); E06B 3/64 (2006.01); E06B 3/663 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/5427 (2013.01); E06B 3/5892 (2013.01); E06B 3/64 (2013.01); E06B 3/66342 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29911500 U1 19990909; EP 1065342 A2 20010103; EP 1065342 A3 20020102

INPADOC legal status

2003-04-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020703

2002-10-24 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-09-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2002-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI