Global patent index - EP 1065357 A2

EP 1065357 A2 2001-01-03 - Engine device

Title (en)

Engine device

Title (de)

Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 1065357 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00111189 A

Priority

JP 14376099 A

Abstract (en)

An engine device having an engine body provided with a crankshaft and balancer shafts adapted to rotate in association with the crankshaft, with the engine body covered with an engine cover, whereby engine auxiliary is integrally incorporated in the engine cover. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02B 39/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02B 67/00 (2006.01); F01M 1/02 (2006.01); F01P 5/10 (2006.01); F02B 67/06 (2006.01); F02B 77/13 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02B 67/06 (2013.01); F01M 1/02 (2013.01); F01P 5/10 (2013.01); F02B 77/13 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1065357 A2 20010103; EP 1065357 A3 20010328; EP 1065357 B1 20040908; DE 60013504 D1 20041014; DE 60013504 T2 20050120; JP 2000337116 A 20001205

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160524

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 17

2005-09-09 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2005-08-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050609

2004-10-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60013504

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-10-14

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-09-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-09-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2004-09-08 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040908

2003-09-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030228

2001-12-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2001-07-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010507

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-02-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7F 02B 67/04 A, 7F 02B 39/04 B

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI