Global Patent Index - EP 1065365 A2

EP 1065365 A2 2001-01-03 - Exhaust gas recirculation valve

Title (en)

Exhaust gas recirculation valve

Title (de)

Abgasrückführventil

Title (fr)

Soupape de recirculation de gaz d'échappement

Publication

EP 1065365 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00109770 A

Priority

DE 19929956 A

Abstract (en)

The unit (1) has an inlet (5) and outlet (2) conduction system with a charged air conductor. The charged air conductor is supplied with exhaust gas by an exhaust gas recirculation conductor and an exhaust gas recirculation valve (9). An exhaust gas supply unit (10) is separated from the exhaust gas recirculation valve and is arranged in an external part (4') of the exhaust gas recirculation conductor.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf eine Abgasrückführanlage 1 für eine Brennkraftmaschine mit einem Ein- und Auslaßleitungssystem 5, 2, das eine Ladeluftleitung 8 aufweist, der über eine Abgasrückführleitung und ein Abgasrückführventil 9 Abgas zugeführt wird, wobei dem in einem externen Teil (4') der Abgasrückführleitung angeordneten Abgasrückführventil 9 eine davon getrennte Abgaszuführeinrichtung 10 zugeordnet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 25/07

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 25/07 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 26/73 (2016.02); F02M 26/21 (2016.02); F02M 26/32 (2016.02); F02M 26/54 (2016.02); F02M 26/67 (2016.02)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1065365 A2 20010103; EP 1065365 A3 20010711; EP 1065365 B1 20030917; DE 19929956 A1 20010111; DE 19929956 C2 20010913; DE 19929956 C5 20070222; US 6386188 B1 20020514

INPADOC legal status


2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100509

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100531

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101201

2011-02-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110131

2011-01-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100509

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090522

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090525

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090513

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-09-26 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2008-09-26 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2004-09-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040618

2004-05-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-02-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040113

2003-10-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50003699 P 20031023

2003-09-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-09-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-04-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2002-01-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011122

2001-08-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010627

2001-07-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI