Global Patent Index - EP 1065375 A2

EP 1065375 A2 2001-01-03 - Crankcase pressure control for swash plate compressor

Title (en)

Crankcase pressure control for swash plate compressor

Title (de)

Regelung des Kurbelkammerdrucks in einem Taumelscheibenkompressor

Title (fr)

Régulation de pression dans la chambre de bielle d'un compresseur à plateau en biais

Publication

EP 1065375 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00113702 A

Priority

JP 18347799 A

Abstract (en)

A piston-type compressor includes a crank chamber (15), a drive shaft (16), cylinder bores (33), and a valve plate (14). The drive shaft (16) passes through the crank chamber (15), and the valve plate is fixed to the rear of the cylinder bores (33). The drive shaft (16) includes a valve body (47). The rear end surface (47a) of the valve body (47) and the front surface of the valve plate (14) form a valve mechanism (46). The valve mechanism (46) is located in the pressurizing passage (18, 12a, 44). The valve mechanism (46) adjusts the opening size of the pressurizing passage (18, 12a, 44) in accordance with the axial movement of the drive shaft (16) from a reference position. This maintains an appropriate relationship between the pressure in the cylinder bores (33) and the pressure in the crank chamber (15). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 27/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 49/00 (2006.01); F04B 27/10 (2006.01); F04B 27/14 (2006.01); F04B 27/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 27/1063 (2013.01); F04B 27/1804 (2013.01); F04B 2027/1813 (2013.01); F04B 2027/189 (2013.01); F04B 2201/12 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1065375 A2 20010103; EP 1065375 A3 20011219; JP 2001012346 A 20010116

INPADOC legal status


2003-07-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030101

2002-09-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR IT

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-12-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000628

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI