Global Patent Index - EP 1065387 A1

EP 1065387 A1 2001-01-03 - Assembly device for at least two fluid power control elements

Title (en)

Assembly device for at least two fluid power control elements

Title (de)

Montagevorrichtung mindestens zweier Druckmittel-Steuerelemente

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'assemblage d'au moins deux éléments de commande par fluide sous pression

Publication

EP 1065387 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00401770 A

Priority

FR 9908246 A

Abstract (en)

The assembly unit for connecting at least two control components using a pressure fluid such as compressed air to actuate valves consists of an interface (1) to which the control components are fixed, inner channels (31) carrying the pressure fluid between inlets and outlets, and at least two faces (121, 122) set at an angle of 30 - 60 degrees to one another, each designed to receive one of the control components.

Abstract (fr)

La présente invention a pour objet un dispositif d'assemblage d'au moins deux éléments de commande par fluide sous pression et composé d'une interface sur laquelle sont fixés lesdits éléments de commande, qui sont essentiellement pneumatiques. L'interface (1) comporte les canalisations (3) de circulation du fluide reliant les orifices d'alimentation et de sortie de celles-ci et au moins deux faces (12) formant entre elles un angle a compris entre 5 et 175° et aptes à recevoir chacune au moins un desdits éléments de commande. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15B 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F16K 27/00 (2006.01); F15B 11/00 (2006.01); F15B 13/00 (2006.01); F15B 13/08 (2006.01); F16K 31/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 13/0814 (2013.01); F15B 13/086 (2013.01); F15B 13/0875 (2013.01); F15B 13/0889 (2013.01); F15B 13/0892 (2013.01); F15B 13/0896 (2013.01); Y10T 137/5109 (2015.04); Y10T 137/87885 (2015.04)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1065387 A1 20010103; EP 1065387 B1 20050112; AT 287045 T 20050115; CA 2312610 A1 20001228; CA 2312610 C 20060404; DE 1065387 T1 20010823; DE 60017320 D1 20050217; DE 60017320 T2 20050602; DK 1065387 T3 20050502; ES 2157868 T1 20010901; ES 2157868 T3 20050701; FR 2795460 A1 20001229; FR 2795460 B1 20020426; JP 2001041341 A 20010213; JP 4227292 B2 20090218; US 6318409 B1 20011120

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-01-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150621

2017-01-31 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20170116

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160516

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160425

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20160610

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160610

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160615

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160614

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160613

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160511

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-16 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150621

2012-04-19 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: DEFINOX SAS, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: S.A. DEFONTAINE, LA BRUFFIERE, FR

- Document: DE 60017320

- Effective date: 20120229

2012-04-19 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60017320

- Representative's name: BOEHMERT & BOEHMERT, DE

- Effective date: 20120229

2012-04-19 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60017320

- Representative's name: BOEHMERT & BOEHMERT ANWALTSPARTNERSCHAFT MBB -, DE

- Effective date: 20120229

2012-03-27 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: DEFINOX SAS

- Effective date: 20120314

2012-03-09 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: DEFINOX SAS, FR

- Effective date: 20120202

2012-02-29 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60017320

- Representative's name: BOEHMERT & BOEHMERT, DE

2012-02-22 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20120126 AND 20120201

2012-02-01 [REG NL SD] ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20120127

2012-01-31 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: DEFINOX SAS

- Free text: S.A. DEFONTAINE#RUE ST. ELOI#85530 LA BRUFFIERE (FR) -TRANSFER TO- DEFINOX SAS#3 RUE DE LA PEPINIERE ZONE INDUSTRIELLE NORD#44190 GETIGNE (FR)

2011-07-15 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: NOVAGRAAF SWITZERLAND SA;CHEMIN DE L'ECHO 3;1213 ONEX (CH)

2010-07-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: S.A. DEFONTAINE

- Free text: S.A. DEFONTAINE#RUE ST. ELOI#85530 LA BRUFFIERE (FR) -TRANSFER TO- S.A. DEFONTAINE#RUE ST. ELOI#85530 LA BRUFFIERE (FR)

2008-04-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050112

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050612

2006-01-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051013

2005-08-24 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2157868 T3

2005-06-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-06-21 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050621

2005-06-21 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050621

2005-05-02 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2005-04-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050405

2005-04-12 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050412

2005-02-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2005-02-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60017320 P 20050217

2005-01-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: WILLIAM BLANC & CIE CONSEILS EN PROPRIETE INDUSTRI

2005-01-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-01-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-01-12 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050112

2005-01-12 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050112

2005-01-12 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050112

2004-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031125

2001-09-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-01 [REG ES BA2A] PROVISIONAL PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2157868 T1

2001-08-23 [DET] DE: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS

2001-08-08 [IECL] IE: TRANSLATION FOR EP CLAIMS FILED

2001-08-01 [TCNL] NL: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS FILED

2001-06-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010406

2001-06-06 [GBC] GB: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED (GB SECTION 78(7)/1977)

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI