Global Patent Index - EP 1065437 A2

EP 1065437 A2 2001-01-03 - Headlight system for motor vehicles

Title (en)

Headlight system for motor vehicles

Title (de)

Scheinwerfersystem für Kraftfahrzeuge

Title (fr)

Système de phares pour véhicule automobile

Publication

EP 1065437 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00305444 A

Priority

CZ 235299 A

Abstract (en)

A headlight system for motor vehicles which comprises a reflector (1), a light source (2), an opaque shield (9) and an actuating member, which member provides for changing of the light source (2) position between the position for the low light beam mode and that for the high light beam mode, whereby the light source (2) is mounted in this actuating member and the resulting force vector induced by this actuating member is situated in proximity of the light source (2) alone. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21S 8/10; F21V 14/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60Q 1/04 (2006.01); B60Q 1/16 (2006.01); F21S 8/10 (2006.01); F21V 13/04 (2006.01); F21V 14/02 (2006.01); F21V 14/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21S 48/1742 (2013.01); F21S 48/1186 (2013.01); F21S 48/1784 (2013.01); F21W 2101/10 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1065437 A2 20010103; EP 1065437 A3 20021030; CZ 9902352 A3 20010214

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030503

2003-08-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-07-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-10-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-10-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI