Global Patent Index - EP 1065438 A1

EP 1065438 A1 2001-01-03 - Vehicle headlight equipped with a gas discharge lamp and improved means for electromagnetic shielding

Title (en)

Vehicle headlight equipped with a gas discharge lamp and improved means for electromagnetic shielding

Title (de)

Kfz-Scheinwerfer mit einer Gasentladungslampe und einer verbesserten, elektromagnetischen Abschirmung

Title (fr)

Projecteur de véhicule automobile equipé d'une lampe à décharge et de moyens de blindage électromagnétique perfectionnés

Publication

EP 1065438 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00401850 A

Priority

FR 9908549 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1798466A1] The motor vehicle headlight has casing (14) with power supply circuit enclosed by conducting outer envelope and arranged to the backside of a discharge lamp (10). The conducting envelope provides electrical continuity between screening braid of a power supply cable (50) and screening of a mirror (20). An independent claim is also included for gas discharge lamp.

Abstract (fr)

Un projecteur de véhicule automobile comprend une lampe à décharge gazeuse (10) associée à un circuit d'alimentation et montée dans un miroir, et des moyens de blindage (16) vis à vis d'émissions électromagnétiques perturbatrices. Selon l'invention, le circuit d'alimentation est reçu dans un logement (15) associé à la lampe à l'arrière àe celle-ci, et les moyens de blindage comprennent un matériau conducteur (16) entourant entièrement ledit logement et apte à assurer la continuité électrique entre une tresse de blindage d'un câble d'alimentation arrivant audit logement et des aménagements de blindage associés au miroir. L'invention propose également une lampe à décharge gazeuse incorporant de tels moyens de blindage. Application à l'amélioration de la compatibilité électromagnétique. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21S 8/10; F21V 25/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21S 8/10 (2006.01); F21V 19/00 (2006.01); F21V 25/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21V 25/00 (2013.01); F21S 48/1109 (2013.01); F21S 48/1186 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1065438 A1 20010103; EP 1065438 B1 20070530; EP 1065438 B2 20110112; DE 60034996 D1 20070712; DE 60034996 T2 20080124; DE 60034996 T3 20110519; EP 1798466 A1 20070620; EP 1798466 B1 20150513; ES 2288148 T3 20080101; ES 2288148 T5 20110321; FR 2795691 A1 20010105; FR 2795691 B1 20010817; US 2001030877 A1 20011018; US 6474856 B2 20021105

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160616

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160615

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160630

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160616

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-03-21 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Effective date: 20110309

2011-03-01 [REG SE RPEO] EP PATENT HAS BEEN REPUBLISHED IN MODIFIED FORM AFTER OPPOSITION AT EPO

2011-01-12 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20110112

2011-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT SE

2008-04-16 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: WANT, CLIFFORD JAMES

- Effective date: 20080228

2008-04-09 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: VALEO VISION

- Effective date: 20080228

2008-01-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2288148 T3

2007-09-25 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2007-07-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60034996 P 20070712

2007-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT SE

2001-09-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES IT SE

2001-07-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010521

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT SE

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI