Global Patent Index - EP 1065440 A2

EP 1065440 A2 2001-01-03 - Light-emitting curtain

Title (en)

Light-emitting curtain

Title (de)

Lichtemittierenter Vorhang

Title (fr)

Rideau émetteur de lumière

Publication

EP 1065440 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00202070 A

Priority

IT GE990022 U

Abstract (en)

A curtain (10,60,92,94) comprising at least one piece of fabric is arranged for hanging from a rail (12,80,92,94). A plurality of electroluminescent strands (22,70,96) are provided with respective pairs of biasing wire electrodes (28,30) arranged along their length. The pairs of electrodes (28,30) of the respective strands (22,60,86) are chain-connected to one another and are connectable to an electric power supply (50,52,54). The electroluminescent strands (22,70,96) hang from respective supports (24,68) spaced at intervals along the width of the curtain (10,60,92,94). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21V 33/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47H 23/08 (2006.01); F21V 33/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47H 23/08 (2013.01); F21V 33/0016 (2013.01); A47H 2023/006 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1065440 A2 20010103; EP 1065440 A3 20030122; IT 248399 Y1 20030128; IT GE990022 U1 20010102; IT GE990022 V0 19990702

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030723

2003-11-13 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-10-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-01-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-01-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2003-01-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 21V 33/00 A, 7A 47H 23/02 B

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI