Global Patent Index - EP 1065442 A1

EP 1065442 A1 2001-01-03 - Combustion plant with water-cooled grate elements

Title (en)

Combustion plant with water-cooled grate elements

Title (de)

Feuerungsanlage mit flüssigkeitsgekühlten Rostelementen

Title (fr)

Instalation de combustion muni d'éléments de grille refroidis à eau

Publication

EP 1065442 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00110634 A

Priority

DE 19929614 A

Abstract (en)

A supply (24) and return (22) connect to a condensing device (23) open to the atmosphere. In the supply a U-shaped cooling liquid run-down tank (25) is fitted, one (26) of whose legs has a liquid level corresponding to a randomly selected maximum pressure. A shorter leg connects to a central header (5) for the single grate elements in the grate's levels.

Abstract (de)

Die Feuerungsanlage mit flüssigkeitsgekühlten Rostelementen (2.1 bis 2.5) weist einen Zulauf (24) und einen Rücklauf (22) zu diesen Rostelementen auf, wobei der Zulauf und der Rücklauf mit einer zur Atmosphäre offenen Kondensationsvorrichtung (23) in Verbindung stehen. In dem Zulauf ist eine U-förmige Kühlflüssigkeitsvorlage (25) angeordnet, deren einer Schenkel (26) eine Flüssigkeitshöhe aufweist, die einem willkürlich gewählten maximalen Druck entspricht. Der andere kürzere Schenkel ist mit einem Zentralverteiler (5) für die einzelnen Rostelemente der Roststufen (2.1 bis 2.5) verbunden ist. Der Abstand zwischen dem tiefsten Punkt der Kühlmittelströmung des tiefsten Rostelementes zum oberen Punkt des kürzeren Schenkels entspricht einem wählbaren Sicherheitshöhenmaß, welches einen Druck erzeugt, der der Ausbreitung von in den Rostelementen entstehenden Dampfbasen entgegenwirkt, um eine Umkehrung der Strömungsrichtung des Kühlmittels zu verhindern. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23H 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23H 17/00 (2006.01); F23H 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23H 3/02 (2013.01); F23H 2900/03021 (2013.01); Y10T 137/85962 (2015.04)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1065442 A1 20010103; EP 1065442 B1 20040331; AT 263337 T 20040415; BR 0002889 A 20010130; CA 2311043 A1 20001228; CA 2311043 C 20040803; CZ 20002384 A3 20010214; CZ 289700 B6 20020313; DE 19929614 A1 20010111; DE 19929614 C2 20010426; DK 1065442 T3 20040719; ES 2218027 T3 20041116; JP 2001021128 A 20010126; JP 3451058 B2 20030929; NO 20003334 A 20001229; NO 20003334 D0 20000626; NO 319294 B1 20050711; PL 191610 B1 20060630; PL 341020 A1 20010102; PT 1065442 E 20040831; RU 2181181 C2 20020410; SG 82081 A1 20010724; TW 550361 B 20030901; US 6378447 B1 20020430

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170519

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170519

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170522

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-08-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20170519

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170526

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-08-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170627

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-08-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20170516

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170519

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170519

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20170519

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170523

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170523

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170519

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-05-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2005-03-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050104

2004-12-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-12-01 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2218027 T3

2004-08-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20040609

2004-07-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040624

2004-07-19 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2004-06-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-05-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040531

2004-05-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: MICHELI & CIE INGENIEURS-CONSEILS

2004-05-11 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-05-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50005854 P 20040506

2004-05-05 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-03-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-03-31 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-03-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040331

2001-09-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001113

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI