Global Patent Index - EP 1065447 A3

EP 1065447 A3 2002-11-20 - Distribution manifold for thermal system with forced circulation

Title (en)

Distribution manifold for thermal system with forced circulation

Title (de)

Verteiler für thermisches System mit Zwangsumlauf

Title (fr)

Manifold de distribution pour système thermique à circulation forcée

Publication

EP 1065447 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00202307 A

Priority

IT TO990123 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1065447A2] A distribution manifold for forced circulation heating system comprising a first set of connections (27, 42) apt to associate it with delivery and recirculation lines (4, 10) of the first part of the heating system (3) which presents radiant ducts (8) built in walls and a second set of connections (39, 40, 41) apt to associate it with delivery and recirculation lines (16, 17) of the second part of the heating system (12) which presents external radiators (14). According to the present invention said distribution manifold (2) is obtained as a single monobloc (22). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24D 3/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24D 3/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24D 3/1066 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1065447 A2 20010103; EP 1065447 A3 20021120; IT TO990123 U1 20010102

INPADOC legal status


2004-03-10 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030521

2003-09-11 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-08-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI