Global Patent Index - EP 1065454 A1

EP 1065454 A1 2001-01-03 - Air-cooled condenser

Title (en)

Air-cooled condenser

Title (de)

Luftgekühlter Kondensator

Title (fr)

condenseur à refroidissement par air

Publication

EP 1065454 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99112652 A

Priority

EP 99112652 A

Abstract (en)

A flat tube (8) with its first flat side (9) bonded in metal is fitted onto an outer capacitor flat tube (2) in an undercooling zone (U) and has multiple current channels (10) with a hydraulic diameter larger than that of the outer capacitor flat tube. A second flat side (11) of the flat tube is bonded in metal with a corrugated cooling fin (13). The flat tube flows with both its ends into collecting devices (5) stretched over the undercooling zone with an extra partition (12) at its end to separate another substance from the cooling substance.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen luftgekühlten Kondensator (1) der Parallelflußbauart als Bestandteil von Klimaanlagen in Fahrzeugen. Dieser Kondensator kann zur Kühlung anderer Betriebsstoffe, z.B. Lenkhilfeöl, herangezogen werden und wird gekennzeichnet dadurch, daß an das äußere Kondensator-Flachrohr (2) der Unterkühlungszone (U) mindestens ein Flachrohr (8) mit seiner einen Flachseite (9) metallisch verbunden angeordnet ist, das eine Vielzahl von Strömungskanälen (10) aufweist deren hydraulischer Durchmesser wesentlich größer ist als der der Kondensator-Flachrohre (2), wobei die andere Flachseite (11) des Flachrohres (8) metallisch mit einer Wellrippe (13) verbunden ist und daß das Flachrohr (8) mit seinen beiden Enden in gegenüberliegende Sammler (5;6) mündet, die über die Unterkühlungszone (U) hinaus verlängert sind und am Ende der Unterkühlungszone je eine zusätzliche Trennwand (12) aufweisen, um ein anderes Medium vom Kältemittel zu trennen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25B 39/04; B60H 1/32; F28D 1/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25B 39/04 (2006.01); F28D 1/04 (2006.01); F28D 1/053 (2006.01); F28D 7/00 (2006.01); F28F 1/02 (2006.01); F25B 40/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28D 1/05391 (2013.01); F25B 39/04 (2013.01); F28D 1/0443 (2013.01); F28D 7/0008 (2013.01); F28F 1/022 (2013.01); F25B 40/02 (2013.01); F25B 2500/01 (2013.01); F28D 2021/0084 (2013.01); F28F 2009/0287 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1065454 A1 20010103

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20160202

2008-06-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080523

2001-09-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010703

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI