Global Patent Index - EP 1065460 A1

EP 1065460 A1 2001-01-03 - Calcination process of ore compositions

Title (en)

Calcination process of ore compositions

Title (de)

Kalzinierungsverfahren für Materialen auf Basis von Erzen

Title (fr)

Procédé de calcination d'un matériau à base de minerai

Publication

EP 1065460 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00401749 A

Priority

FR 9908561 A

Abstract (en)

Oxygen-rich gas is injected closed to the fuel feed point. Volumetric oxygen concentration in the gas exceeds that in gases leaving the rotary kiln (4), which also pass through the pre-heater (3). The injected gas oxygen content is preferably 1%-40%, preferably 1%-10% that required for stoichiometric combustion of the fuel gases injected.

Abstract (fr)

Dans ce procédé : on fait passer le matériau dans un dispositif de précalcination (3) muni d'au moins un injecteur de combustible en sortie duquel une zone d'injection de combustible est formée, puis, on fait passer le matériau au moins partiellement calciné dans le four rotatif (4) muni à son extrémité aval d'un ensemble de combustion primaire (16). On injecte à proximité de la zone d'injection au moins un fluide riche en oxygène de concentration volumique en oxygène supérieure à celle des produits de combustion issus du four rotatif, de manière à apporter à l'aide du fluide riche en oxygène de 1% à 40%, de préférence de 1% à 10%, de l'oxygène stoéchiométrique nécessaire à la combustion du combustible injecté par l'injecteur. Application à la production de clinker. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F27B 7/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C04B 2/10 (2006.01); B01J 6/00 (2006.01); C04B 7/44 (2006.01); F27B 7/10 (2006.01); F27B 7/12 (2006.01); F27B 7/20 (2006.01); F27B 7/34 (2006.01); F27B 7/36 (2006.01); F27D 19/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F27B 7/2033 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1065460 A1 20010103; CA 2312549 A1 20010102; CN 1290846 A 20010411; FR 2795716 A1 20010105; FR 2795716 B1 20010803; JP 2001046861 A 20010220; US 6318278 B1 20011120

INPADOC legal status


2005-05-11 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050319

2003-03-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030124

2002-04-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: L'AIR LIQUIDE, S.A. A DIRECTOIRE ET CONSEIL DE SUR

2001-09-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010703

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI