Global Patent Index - EP 1065562 A1

EP 1065562 A1 2001-01-03 - Base film with a conductive layer and a magnetic layer

Title (en)

Base film with a conductive layer and a magnetic layer

Title (de)

Trägerfilm mit einer leitenden Schicht und einer magnetischen Schicht

Title (fr)

Pellicule de base avec une couche conductrice et une couche magnétique

Publication

EP 1065562 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00113314 A

Priority

US 34335299 A

Abstract (en)

A base film having good exhibiting good adhesion between the layers includes a substrate, a conductive layer, a magnetic layer, and an adhesion prime layer including a chlorinated polymer, such that the adhesion prime layer is disposed between the conductive layer and the magnetic layer. These layers are particularly useful in photographic elements and are typically located on a surface of the substrate that is opposite an emulsion layer The adhesion prime layer is formed from composition including a non-aqueous solvent based chlorinated polymer. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03C 1/93; G03C 1/85

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03C 1/85 (2006.01); G03C 1/93 (2006.01); G03C 1/89 (2006.01); G03C 5/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03C 1/85 (2013.01); G03C 1/93 (2013.01); G03C 1/853 (2013.01); G03C 1/89 (2013.01); G03C 5/14 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

G03C 1/89 + G03C 2200/51

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1065562 A1 20010103

INPADOC legal status


2006-11-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060314

2005-11-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FERRANIA TECHNOLOGIES S.P.A.

2004-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031124

2001-09-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2001-08-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010622

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI