Global Patent Index - EP 1065574 A1

EP 1065574 A1 2001-01-03 - A direct electrostatic printing device incorporating an intermediate image receiving member and a printhead structure at constant distance from this intermediate image receiving member

Title (en)

A direct electrostatic printing device incorporating an intermediate image receiving member and a printhead structure at constant distance from this intermediate image receiving member

Title (de)

Vorrichtung für direktes elektrostatisches Drucken mit einem Zwischenbildträger und einem Druckkopf mit konstanten Abstand mit diesem Zwischenbildträger

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'impression électrostatique direct comprenant un élément intermédiaire de réception d'image et une tête d'impression à distance constante de cet élément intermédiaire de réception d'image

Publication

EP 1065574 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99202107 A

Priority

EP 99202107 A

Abstract (en)

A DEP device, wherein the gap (g) between a conveyor (101) for charged toner particles, i.e. a CTC, and an intermediate image receiving medium (103) is kept constant and wherein also the distance (d) between this intermediate image receiving medium (103) and the printhead structure (105) are kept constant. This results in the fact that the distance (d2) between the conveyor (101) for charged toner particles and the printhead structure (105) is kept constant without having the printhead structure contacting the CTC or having spacer means inserted between the CTC and the printhead structure. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03G 15/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03G 15/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03G 15/346 (2013.01); G03G 2217/0025 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1065574 A1 20010103

INPADOC legal status


2003-07-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030103

2002-02-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AGFA-GEVAERT

2001-09-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-09-19 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20010703;LT PAYMENT 20010703;LV PAYMENT 20010703;MK PAYMENT 20010703;RO PAYMENT 20010703;SI PAYMENT 20010703

2001-08-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010703

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI