Global Patent Index - EP 1065636 A2

EP 1065636 A2 2001-01-03 - Method for determining a win value corresponding to a game result in a slot machine

Title (en)

Method for determining a win value corresponding to a game result in a slot machine

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Ermitteln eines Gewinnwertes beim Erreichen eines Spielergebnisses an einem münzbetätigten Unterhaltungsautomaten

Title (fr)

Procédé pour déterminer une somme gagnée qui correspond à un résultat de jeu d'une machine à sous

Publication

EP 1065636 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99203620 A

Priority

DE 19929865 A

Abstract (en)

The slot machine includes an indicator board for displaying the winning prize (10). In addition, an additional smaller gamble indicator (12) is provided which has display panels with winning amounts, at least one of the amounts being variable. The variable amount may be a jackpot, which is continuously filled from a proportion of the gaming stakes. There may be two jackpots filled with differing proportions of the stakes.

Abstract (de)

2.1 Münzbetätigte Unterhaltungsautomaten umfassen eine Symbol-Spieleinrichtung, von der bei Stillstand der Umlaufkörper eine gewinn- oder nichtgewinnbringende Symbolkombination angezeigt wird. Der der angezeigten Symbolkombination zugeordnete Gewinnwert kann nachfolgend unter Verlustgefahr in einem Risikospiel gegen einen nächst höheren Gewinn eingesetzt werden. Mit der Neuerung soll gewährleistet werden, daß der Spieler unabhängig vom Spieleinsatz stets eine maximale Spielspannung erhalten kann. 2.2 Erzielt wird dies dadurch, daß kontinuierlich vom Spieleinsatz ein Jackpot aufgefüllt wird und zum unbekannten Zeitpunkt zur Auslösung ansteht. Ein erzielter Gewinnwert kann im Risikospiel gegen den Jackpot eingesetzt werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07F 17/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07F 17/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 17/3267 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 2938307 A1 19810409 - GAUSELMANN PAUL

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1065636 A2 20010103; EP 1065636 A3 20010307; AU 3256800 A 20010104; AU 763203 B2 20030717; DE 19929865 A1 20010104; US 6491583 B1 20021210

INPADOC legal status


2010-12-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100601

2009-03-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090128

2001-11-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-11-28 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20010328;LT PAYMENT 20010328;LV PAYMENT 20010328;MK PAYMENT 20010328;RO PAYMENT 20010328;SI PAYMENT 20010328

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010328

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI