Global Patent Index - EP 1065674 A3

EP 1065674 A3 2001-12-05 - Downhole cable

Title (en)

Downhole cable

Title (de)

Bohrlochkabel

Title (fr)

Câble de fond de puits

Publication

EP 1065674 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00305534 A

Priority

GB 9915141 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1065674A2] A downhole cable (10) for use in an oil or gas well is described as having a pair of conductors (12, 14) for transmission of power and/or data, and a separate load bearing member (16). A non-conductive outer sheath (18) is also preferably provided. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01B 7/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01B 7/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01B 7/046 (2013.01); H01B 9/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1065674 A2 20010103; EP 1065674 A3 20011205; EP 1065674 B1 20061102; GB 9915141 D0 19990901

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170622

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-07-18 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20120621 AND 20120627

2007-10-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070803

2007-05-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2007-02-02 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070202

2006-11-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2006-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DK GB IT NL

2006-11-02 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061102

2006-11-02 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061102

2004-05-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040405

2002-10-02 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-08-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DK GB IT NL

2002-04-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020130

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DK GB IT NL

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI