Global Patent Index - EP 1065683 A2

EP 1065683 A2 2001-01-03 - Circuit breaker with terminals for different rated currents

Title (en)

Circuit breaker with terminals for different rated currents

Title (de)

Leistungsschalter mit Anschlussschienen für verschiedene Nennströme

Title (fr)

Disjonteur avec des bornes pour plusieurs intensités nominales

Publication

EP 1065683 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00250212 A

Priority

DE 19930813 A

Abstract (en)

A low-voltage (LV) circuit-breaker has a housing comprising of a rear-wall and a front-part, and containing a contact system which has at least one, ideally two, approximately parallel, withdrawable connection rails or bars, for connecting the contact system to an external circuit. The connection rails extend through window apertures located in the rear wall of the housing and are positioned in the housing by spacers. One of the connection rails serves as a carrier for a positionally-fixed switching contact and a arcing horn, while the other connection rails are joined via a hinged- or flexible-conduction arrangement to a moveable switching contact of the switching contact system. The connecting rails (2;3) are shaped so that the spacers (12-15) are each integrated as an integral part into the connection rails (2;3). The cross-section of the current-carrying part of each connection rail is selected to correspond to the required rated current of the LV circuit-breaker (1).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Niederspannungs-Leistungsschalter (1) mit aus einem profilierten Halbzeug hergestellten Anschlußschienen, bei dem die Anschlußschienen (2; 3) so gestaltet sind, daß die Distanzstücke (12; 13; 14; 15) jeweils als einstückiges Teil in die Anschlußschienen (2; 3) integriert sind. Dabei ist der Querschnitt des stromtragenden Teiles jeder Anschlußschiene (2; 3)dem geforderten Bemessungsstrom des Niederspannungs-Leistungsschalters (1) entsprechend gewählt und die Abmessungen der Distanzstücke entsprechen der Differenz zwischen der Dicke der verwendeten Anschlußschienen (2;3) und der Größe der Durchtrittsöffnungen (10; 11). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 1/58; H01H 71/04; H01H 71/06; H01H 71/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 1/58 (2006.01); H01H 11/00 (2006.01); H01H 71/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 1/58 (2013.01); H01H 11/0031 (2013.01); H01H 71/08 (2013.01); H01H 9/52 (2013.01); H01H 2011/0093 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1065683 A2 20010103; EP 1065683 A3 20020327; EP 1065683 B1 20030416; DE 19930813 A1 20010104

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160819

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120702

2013-03-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130228

2011-07-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110630

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090627

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090627

2010-02-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090627

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080616

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080626

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-04-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040119

2004-01-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-11-26 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 1065683E

2003-08-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030723

2003-05-28 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-05-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50001767 P 20030522

2003-04-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-04-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-12-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2002-06-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020422

2002-03-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-03-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI