Global Patent Index - EP 1065699 A1

EP 1065699 A1 2001-01-03 - Incandescent lamp incorporating a tube-shaped glass vessel enclosing an axially accommodated filament

Title (en)

Incandescent lamp incorporating a tube-shaped glass vessel enclosing an axially accommodated filament

Title (de)

Rohrförmiges Glasgefäss umfassende Glühlampe mit einem längseingebautem Filament

Title (fr)

Lampe à incandescence comprenant une ampoule en verre de forme tubulaire dans laquelle est disposé axialement un filament

Publication

EP 1065699 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00202142 A

Priority

FR 9908236 A

Abstract (en)

The lamps filament is encased in a glass tube whose ends are hermetically sealed by pinching around a metallic sheet to which are fixed interior and exterior electrical current connections. A second intermediate flat sheet is directly connected to the end of the filament between the latter and the interior current connection. The glass tube is bent at the position of the second sheet. The spiral type filament has one of its coils soldered to the second plate..

Abstract (fr)

L'extrémité de l'ampoule en verre (3) est fermée hermétiquement par un pincement (5) appliqué autour d'une feuille métallique (1) à laquelle sont fixées une prise de courant extérieure (7) et une prise de courant intérieure (6) reliée électriquement au filament (4). Une seconde feuille plate intermédiaire (2) est connectée directement à l'extrémité (9) du filament, entre ce dernier et la prise de courant intérieure (6), et l'ampoule est coudée au niveau de la dite seconde feuille plate(2). Applications : entre autres, lampes halogène pour chauffage. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01K 1/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 3/44 (2006.01); H01K 1/16 (2006.01); H01K 1/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01K 1/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1065699 A1 20010103; EP 1065699 B1 20050406; CN 1263085 C 20060705; CN 1284738 A 20010221; DE 60019201 D1 20050512; DE 60019201 T2 20060309; FR 2795553 A1 20001229; JP 2001060451 A 20010306; US 6680572 B1 20040120

INPADOC legal status


2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140101

2014-04-17 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60019201

- Effective date: 20140101

2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120702

2013-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120619

2013-03-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130228

2013-02-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120619

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120830

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110722

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110630

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-03-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060110

2005-08-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050713

2005-05-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60019201 P 20050512

2005-04-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2005-04-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-09-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-08-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010703

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI