Global Patent Index - EP 1065749 A1

EP 1065749 A1 2001-01-03 - Connection accessory for electrical apparatus, in particular for modular electrical apparatus

Title (en)

Connection accessory for electrical apparatus, in particular for modular electrical apparatus

Title (de)

Verbindungszusatzgerät für elektrische Apparate, ins besondere für modulare elektrische Apparate

Title (fr)

Accessoire de raccordement pour appareillages électriques, en particulier pour appareillages électriques modulaires.

Publication

EP 1065749 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00401592 A

Priority

FR 9908565 A

Abstract (en)

Connection link (23) uses supple electric cable (24), and comprises flat pins (27), at each end. Pins extend slightly perpendicular to electric cable, and are electrically linked to conductive core (25). Link also has end piece (36) made of isolating material, covering end of cable, and comprising facet (37) extending oblique relative to electric cable.

Abstract (fr)

Il s'agit d'un accessoire de raccordement (23) du genre mettant en oeuvre un câble électrique (24). Suivant l'invention, le câble électrique (24) est un câble électrique souple, et, conjointement, l'accessoire de raccordement (23) comporte, à demeure, à chacune des extrémités de ce câble électrique (24), une broche (27) plate, qui s'étend sensiblement perpendiculairement à ce câble électrique (24), et qui est électriquement reliée à l'âme conductrice (25) de celui-ci. Application, notamment, au raccordement d'appareillages électriques modulaires disposés suivant deux rangées parallèles. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 9/26; H01H 71/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 71/08 (2006.01); H01R 9/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 71/082 (2013.01); H01R 9/2675 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES FR IT PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1065749 A1 20010103; EP 1065749 B1 20070221; ES 2282085 T3 20071016; FR 2795874 A1 20010105; FR 2795874 B1 20011012

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160629

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-06-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110606

2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100607

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110705

2011-07-15 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20110715

2010-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100626

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090526

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20071122

2007-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2282085

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2007-07-23 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070723

2007-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): ES FR IT PT

2006-12-21 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-09-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: ES FR IT PT

2001-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010621

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): ES FR IT PT

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI