Global patent index - EP 1065761 A1

EP 1065761 A1 2001-01-03 - Electric connector

Title (en)

Electric connector

Title (de)

Elektrischer Verbinder

Title (fr)

Connecteur électrique

Publication

EP 1065761 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00113934 A

Priority

JP 18919199 A

Abstract (en)

An electric connector 30 is constituted, comprising a first connector 13 including a plurality of signal terminals and mounted on a substrate, a second connector 14 including three connecting pins 14a, 14b and 14c arranged at regular intervals, first and third connecting pins being connected to two signal terminals of the first connector which are to carry out signal switching, and signals to be switched being supplied to the first and third connecting pins through a normally closed type contact portion and directly supplied to the second connecting pin, and an auto fuse 40 including two contact portions arranged at regular intervals such that it is selectively engaged with two continuous connecting pins 15a and 15b on one side or the other side of the second connector, the two contact portions being electrically connected to each other, and serving to open the normally closed type contact portion provided in contact with the first or third connecting pin during the engagement with the second connector. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 31/08; H01R 9/24; H01R 13/68; H01R 29/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/68 (2011.01); H01R 9/24 (2006.01); H01R 13/688 (2011.01); H01R 27/00 (2006.01); H01R 29/00 (2006.01); H01R 31/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/68 (2013.01); H01R 9/245 (2013.01); H01R 29/00 (2013.01); H01R 31/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1065761 A1 20010103; EP 1065761 B1 20030326; DE 60001773 D1 20030430; DE 60001773 T2 20030918; JP 2001023742 A 20010126

INPADOC legal status

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100101

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-03-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20100226

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080617

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080703

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070608

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-06-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070628

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-06-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060608

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-03-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20031230

2004-01-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-04-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60001773

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-04-30

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-03-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2001-09-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR

2001-07-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010611

2001-04-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010208

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI