Global Patent Index - EP 1065762 A1

EP 1065762 A1 2001-01-03 - Connector assembly for male electrical contact

Title (en)

Connector assembly for male electrical contact

Title (de)

Verbindungsanordnung für Steckerkontakt

Title (fr)

Ensemble de connexion pour cosse électrique mâle

Publication

EP 1065762 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00401829 A

Priority

FR 9908367 A

Abstract (en)

Lug (18) comprises stamp (24) defining an oversize allowance on one of its sides, and a hole on its other side. Interconnecting elements include conductive blades such as blade comprising two elongated holes. The dimensions of the elongated holes are such that blades are attached with clearance on the free end of lug, and attached tightly around the oversize. Independent claims are also included for a timer, and for a method for connecting an electric conductor to a male electric lug.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne un ensemble de connexion pour connecter un conducteur électrique à une cosse électrique mâle (18) d'un dispositif électrique, la cosse étant formée d'une lame en matériau électriquement conducteur et l'ensemble comprenant au moins un organe de connexion en matériau électriquement conducteur comportant au moins un orifice allongé de forme correspondant à une section transversale d'une cosse. La cosse possède une surépaisseur (25), réalisée notamment par emboutissage, sur au moins une de ses faces dans sa partie la plus éloignée de son extrémité libre et les dimensions de l'orifice sont telles que l'organe de connexion s'engage avec jeu sur l'extrémité libre de la cosse et de façon serrée sur la surépaisseur. Application aux minuteries d'appareils électroménagers. <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 31/08; H01H 43/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 31/08 (2006.01); H01H 43/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 31/085 (2013.01); H01H 43/024 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1065762 A1 20010103; EP 1065762 B1 20040811; DE 60012829 D1 20040916; DE 60012829 T2 20050901; FR 2797100 A1 20010202; FR 2797100 B1 20010907

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070627

2008-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070702

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080101

2008-04-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20080229

2006-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060630

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-06-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060622

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-05-22 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060522

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-08-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050512

2004-09-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60012829

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-09-16

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-08-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2001-09-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR IT

2001-07-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010515

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI