Global Patent Index - EP 1065776 A1

EP 1065776 A1 2001-01-03 - Rotor assembly

Title (en)

Rotor assembly

Title (de)

Rotoranordnung

Title (fr)

Ensemble rotor

Publication

EP 1065776 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00305177 A

Priority

US 32926099 A

Abstract (en)

An rotor assembly 10 for use with an electrical machine. Assembly 10 includes two opposing and selectively intermeshing pole pieces 12, 14. Each pole piece 12, 14 has a body 16 and a plurality of integrally formed and outwardly extending projections or pole fingers 18. A plurality of magnets 34 are each fixedly secured, by use of swaged portions 36, within a unique one of several slots 38 which are co-operatively formed between a unique one of fingers 18 and a unique portion of body 16 of pole pieces 12, 14. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H02K 1/22; H02K 15/03

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H02K 1/22 (2006.01); H02K 15/03 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H02K 21/044 (2013.01); H02K 15/03 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49009 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] US 4339873 A 19820720 - KANAMARU HISANOBU, et al
  • [A] US 4327302 A 19820427 - HERSHBERGER DORAN D
  • [XA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1998, no. 02 30 January 1998 (1998-01-30)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1997, no. 11 28 November 1997 (1997-11-28)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 018, no. 434 (E - 1592) 12 August 1994 (1994-08-12)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1998, no. 08 30 June 1998 (1998-06-30)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1065776 A1 20010103; US 2001000291 A1 20010419; US 6172441 B1 20010109; US 6526646 B2 20030304

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-15 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050422

2001-09-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE GB SE

2001-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010618

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB SE

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI