Global patent index - EP 1065903 A2

EP 1065903 A2 2001-01-03 - Method for allocating transmission resources in a centrally administered communication system

Title (en)

Method for allocating transmission resources in a centrally administered communication system

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Vergabe von Übertragungsressourcen in einem zentralgesteuerten Kommunikationssystem

Title (fr)

Procédé pour allouer des ressources de transmission dans un système de communication à commande centrale

Publication

EP 1065903 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00113521 A

Priority

DE 19929385 A

Abstract (en)

The allocation is performed for frame-oriented connections of deterministic type, i.e. at a substantially constant data rate, by a central office (ZE), independently of previous resource requests made by a terminal (T1,T2...). A specific identification is used to differentiate such connections from other connections. Non-synchronicities between the central office and the terminals are corrected for such connections.

Abstract (de)

Die Vergabe von Übertraungsressourcen in zentralgesteuerten Kommunikationsnetzen wird für rahmenorientierte Verbindungen mit weitgehend konstanter Datenrate unabhängig von vorhergehenden Ressourcenanforderungen durch ein Terminal (T1, T2 ...) durchgeführt. Solche Verbindungen werden besonders gekennzeichnet. Es kann auf eine Ressourcenanforderung durch Terminals (T1, T2 ...) für solche Verbindungen verzichtet werden, wodurch sich die Verarbeitung in einem Terminal vereinfacht und Übertragungsressourcenkapazität eingespart wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04Q 7/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04L 12/28 (2006.01); H04L 12/56 (2006.01); H04W 72/04 (2009.01); H04W 8/26 (2009.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04W 28/16 (2013.01); H04W 8/26 (2013.01); H04W 28/22 (2013.01); H04W 76/021 (2013.01); H04W 88/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1065903 A2 20010103; EP 1065903 A3 20031029; DE 19929385 A1 20010104; US 6781997 B1 20040824

INPADOC legal status

2007-11-07 [18R] REFUSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18R

- Effective date: 20050523

2004-11-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-07-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE

2004-06-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20040429

2003-10-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-10-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI