Global patent index - EP 1065911 A2

EP 1065911 A2 2001-01-03 - Electroacoustic transducer

Title (en)

Electroacoustic transducer

Title (de)

Elektroakustischer Wandler

Title (fr)

Transducteur électroacoustique

Publication

EP 1065911 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00890203 A

Priority

AT 113599 A

Abstract (en)

The transducer has a magnetic armature and a cover (4). An additional cover (6) is provided near to the transducer, in addition to the cover (4) further from the transducer. Openings (5,9) are provided in both covers and/or between the covers, and there is relative displacement between the openings on each cover. At least part of the path of particles penetrating into the transducer between the far cover (4) and the diaphragm (1) passes from higher to lower magnetic potential.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen elektroakustischen Wandler mit einem Magnetsystem und mit einer Abdeckung. Die Erfindung ist dadurch gekennzeichnet, daß eine weitere Abdeckung vorgesehen ist, daß sowohl in der wandlerfernen Abdeckung (4) und der wandlernahen Abdeckung (6), bzw. zwischen ihnen, Öffnungen (5, 9) vorgesehen sind, die von Abdeckung zu Abdeckung zueinander versetzt sind, und daß jeder Weg in den Wandler eindringender Partikel zwischen der wandlerfernen Abdeckung (4) und der Membrane (1) ein Teilstück aufweist, das von höherem zu niedrigerem magnetischen Potential führt. Bevorzugt ist vorgesehen, daß die Bereiche (7) der wandlernahen Abdeckung (6), die den Öffnungen (5) der wandlerfernen Abdeckung (4) gegenüberliegen, einen geringeren Abstand zum Magnetsystem (3) des Wandlers aufweisen als die sie umgebenden Bereiche, in denen die Öffnungen (9) der wandlernahen Abdeckung (6) angeordnet sind.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04R 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04R 9/02 (2006.01); H04R 9/06 (2006.01); H04R 9/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04R 9/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL LT LV MK RO SI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1065911 A2 20010103; EP 1065911 A3 20080213; AT 412696 B 20050525; AT A113599 A 20041015; JP 2001045593 A 20010216

INPADOC legal status

2009-03-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20080814

2008-12-04 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2008-10-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2008-02-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2008-02-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2008-02-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: H04R 9/06 20060101AFI20080104BHEP

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI