Global Patent Index - EP 1065948 A1

EP 1065948 A1 2001-01-10 - SYSTEM FOR CONTINUOUSLY PREPARING AT LEAST TWO DIFFERENT LIQUID FOODSTUFF MIXTURES

Title (en)

SYSTEM FOR CONTINUOUSLY PREPARING AT LEAST TWO DIFFERENT LIQUID FOODSTUFF MIXTURES

Title (de)

ANLAGE ZUR KONTINUIERLICHEN BEREITSTELLUNG VON MINDESTENS ZWEI UNTERSCHIEDLICHEN FLÜSSIGEN LEBENSMITTELGEMISCHEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE PREPARER EN CONTINU AU MOINS DEUX MELANGES CONSTITUES D'ALIMENTS LIQUIDES DIFFERENTS

Publication

EP 1065948 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99942575 A

Priority

  • CH 70398 A
  • IB 9900499 W
  • US 66726700 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9948387A1] Storage containers (4, 14) located in a first supply station (1) are provided for mixed constituents which are characteristic of a first product. Outflow lines (8, 18) which can be closed run out of the storage containers (4, 14) via first closing devices (61, 62). A second set of storage containers (24, 34) located in a second supply station (2) are provided for mixed constituents which are characteristic of an additional product. Second outflow lines (48, 58, 68) which can be closed run out of the second set of storage containers (24, 34) via second closing devices (63, 70). Storage containers (44, 54, 64) located in the third supply station (3) are provided for mixed constituents which are available in both products to be produced. Outflow lines (48, 58, 68) are permanently open when the system is in operation. The first outflow lines (8, 18) communicate with the outflow lines (48, 58, 68) of the third supply station (3) via a transport line (20) having a stop valve (21). The additional outflow lines (28, 38) communicate with the outflow lines of the third supply station (3) via a transport line (22) having a second stop valve (23).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A23L 2/52; A23L 2/54; B01F 15/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A23L 2/00 (2006.01); A23L 2/52 (2006.01); A23L 2/54 (2006.01); B01F 3/08 (2006.01); B01F 13/10 (2006.01); B01F 15/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01F 3/08 (2013.01); B01F 13/1055 (2013.01); B01F 15/04 (2013.01); B01F 2215/0014 (2013.01); Y10S 366/601 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9948387A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9948387 A1 19990930; AT 239386 T 20030515; AU 3270899 A 19991018; BR 9909088 A 20001205; BR 9909088 B1 20110823; CN 1170621 C 20041013; CN 1298281 A 20010606; DE 59905464 D1 20030612; EP 1065948 A1 20010110; EP 1065948 B1 20030507; ES 2197667 T3 20040101; ID 27877 A 20010503; JP 2002507470 A 20020312; JP 4445127 B2 20100407; RU 2000126762 A 20040127; RU 2187231 C2 20020820; US 6280075 B1 20010828

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160324

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160311

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160323

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160208

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160225

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151223

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160311

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160211

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160310

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160315

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-11-15 [REG AT PC] CHANGE OF THE OWNER

- Owner name: MITECO AG, CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC

- Ref Document Number: 239386

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20131009

2013-07-26 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: MITECO AG, CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

- Effective date: 20130625

2013-07-17 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20130620 AND 20130626

2013-06-26 [REG NL SD] ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS

- Ref Legal Event Code: SD

- Effective date: 20130618

2013-06-20 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

- Owner name: MITECO AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

- Effective date: 20130610

2013-05-31 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Owner name: MITECO A.G.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BECA

- Effective date: 20130528

2013-05-31 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Owner name: FRIKARTSTRASSE 5,CH-4800 ZOFINGEN

- Ref Legal Event Code: BECA

- Effective date: 20130528

2013-04-30 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: MITECO AG, CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

2013-04-04 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: MITECO AG, CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59905464

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130207

2013-04-04 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: MITECO AG, CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59905464

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130207

2013-04-04 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59905464

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: KLUNKER, SCHMITT-NILSON, HIRSCH, DE

- Effective date: 20130207

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: MITECO AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2004-04-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040210

2004-02-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-01-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2197667

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-10-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

2003-07-22 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2003-06-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59905464

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-06-12

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-05-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2003-05-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2003-05-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: CADEO, ANGELO

2002-07-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020604

2001-01-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000923

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE